JTH Tax, Inc. v. Olivo
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond A Jackson |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00345 |
Nature of Suit | 196 Contract - Franchise |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 26, 2016 7:40 AM EST |
Defendant
Daniel Olivo
|
|
Plaintiff
JTH Tax, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, February 26, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 03/01 3:28 PM
Returned Mail as to Daniel Olivo. (cchr) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, February 12, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Fri 02/12 2:58 PM
JUDGMENT entered 2/12/2016. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 2/12/2016. (cchr) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order
Fri 02/12 2:26 PM
PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Today, the court GRANTED Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Defendant is hereby PERMANENTLY ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED from certain acts outlined in this Order. The Court enters permanent injunctive relief as follows: Defendant, his agents, servants, employees, attorneys, consultants, affiliates, successors, and/or assigns and/or any other individual or entity within their control or supervision and/or all other persons or entities acting in concert with Defendant or on his behalf are hereby ORDERED within THIRTY (30) DAYS of entry of this order. (See order for specifics) Copies distributed to the parties and Defendant Olivo's previous address of record. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 2/12/2016. (cchr) |
|
13 | 13
9
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 02/12 1:43 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Olivo, is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that judgment be entered on behalf of Plaintiff and against Defendant. A permanent injunction Order will be issued in a separate document. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to the parties. The Order shall be sent to Defendant at Olivo's previous address of record. IT IS SO ORDERED.Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 2/12/2016. Copies distributed as directed. (cchr) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (other)
Thu 02/04 1:30 PM
NOTICE by JTH Tax, Inc. (Spain, Brett) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
Motion Hearing
Tue 01/26 12:44 PM
Motion Hearing before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson held on 1/26/2016 re7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Olivo with Roseboro,. filed by JTH Tax, Inc. Attorney Brett Spain appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. John Tyler, Corporate Counsel present. No appearance by or on behalf of the defendant. Court conducted inquiry of plaintiffs counsel and made comments. Court GRANTS plaintiffs motion for default judgment and DIRECTS counsel to submit costs and attorney fees within 10 days from today. Court to issue and order. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Janet Collins, OCR.)(ptom, ) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 01/14 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: as to7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Olivo with Roseboro,. :. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2016 at 11:30 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson (ptom, ) |
|
minutes
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/14 2:53 PM
Set Hearing as to7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Olivo with Roseboro,. :. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2016 at 11:30 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (ptom, ) |
||
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (other)
Thu 11/12 2:23 PM
NOTICE by JTH Tax, Inc. re8 Memorandum in Support,7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Olivo with Roseboro,. Notice of Request for Ruling on Motion for Default Judgment Without a Hearing (Bryant, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 10/14 10:40 AM
Memorandum in Support re7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Olivo with Roseboro,. filed by JTH Tax, Inc..(Bryant, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Heather Joyner | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 10/14 10:39 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Olivo with Roseboro,. by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Bryant, Gary) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Status Report
Fri 10/09 10:28 AM
STATUS REPORT by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Bryant, Gary) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 10/08 2:43 PM
Request for Entry of Default as to Daniel Olivo by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Bryant, Gary) |
|
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 10/08 6:05 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Daniel Olivo: Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for failure to file an answer in this action. This default is noted on the Court's docket this date. (bgra) |
||
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
notice
Notice (other)
Tue 09/29 10:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Responsive pleadings to the complaint have not been filed by defendant Daniel Olivo. Counsel is requested to file a status report within fifteen (15) days from the date of this notice. The status report should be in the form of a pleading that conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures.A party seeking reasonable extension of time to respond to the complaint must obtain court approval by filing an appropriate motion with a proposed order. If a party is in default, plaintiff's counsel may file a request for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The request for entry of default should be in the form of a pleading which conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures. re1 Complaint, (bgra) |
||
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/21 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH Tax, Inc. Daniel Olivo served on 8/14/2015, answer due 9/4/2015(lbax, ) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/31 11:03 AM
One Summons, with service copy, Issued as to Daniel Olivo. Phoned counsel to advise service packet is ready for pickup.(epri) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/31 10:56 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by JTH Tax, Inc. (epri) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/31 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Daniel Olivo ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 24683027927.), filed by JTH Tax, Inc.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 13 Letter, | ||
Att: 14 Receipt |