New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 1:03-bk-41713
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2003
Terminated:May 16, 2008

Debtor
Space Systems/Loral, Inc.
3825 Fabian Way
Palo Alto, CA 94303-4604
Represented By
Stephen Karotkin
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2008
8 8 Order signed on 5/14/2008, Granting Application for Final Decree Closing Certain of the Debtor's Chapter 11 Cases. (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Case Closed. (Ebanks, Liza).
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2006
7 7 Withdrawal of Claim(s): (No. 346) Filed by Lockheed Martin Corportation in Case No. 03-41713 filed by Brian M. Metcalf on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Metcalf, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Proof of Claim)
Friday, November 26, 2004
6 6 Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) Claim against Space Systems/Loral, Inc. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Alcatel Espacio(Claim No.362, Amount 24,611.68). To Silver Oak Capital, LLC. filed by Anna C. Lee on behalf of Space Systems/Loral, Inc..(Lee, Anna)
Related: [-]
5 5 Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) Claim against Space Systems/Loral, Inc. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Alcatel Space(Claim No.358, Amount 11,011,910.00). To Silver Oak Capital, LLC. filed by Anna C. Lee on behalf of Space Systems/Loral, Inc..(Lee, Anna)
Related: [-]
4 4 Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) Claim against Space Systems/Loral, Inc. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Alcatel Space(Claim No.360, Amount 8,000,000.00). To Silver Oak Capital, LLC. filed by Anna C. Lee on behalf of Space Systems/Loral, Inc..(Lee, Anna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 13, 2003
Case Joint Adminstration, Lead Case No. 03 B 41710 (RDD). (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Case Joint Adminstration , Lead Case No. 03 B 41710 (RDD). (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 22, 2003
Case Joint Adminstration. All entries are to be made under the Lead Case No. 03 B 41710 (Ho, Amanda).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 16, 2003
3 3 Order signed on 7/15/2003 directing joint administration of chapter 11 cases and the lead Case is 03-41710 (Li, Dorothy).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 15, 2003
2 2 Motion Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered.Fee Amount $ 830, Receipt Number 140093 . Filed by Stephen Karotkin of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Space Systems/Loral, Inc. . (Lee, Lisa)
Related: [-]