Oakfabco, Inc.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | A Benjamin Goldgar |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-27062 |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 29, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Plan Confirmed: | Apr 11, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 25,001-50,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Oakfabco, Inc.
18W140 Butterfield Rd Ste 1100
Oakbrook Terrace, IL 60181-4845 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Asbestos Claimants' Committee
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |