Good Time Stores, Inc.
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | H Christopher Mott |
Case #: | 3:15-bk-31243 |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 08, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | May 10, 2016 |
Converted: | Dec 18, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Good Time Stores, Inc.
7108 Airport Rd
El Paso, TX 79906-4909 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Ronald E Ingalls
PO Box 2867
Fredericksburg, TX 78624 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/06/2015 7:00 PM CDT |
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
crditcrd
ICC-Fee Paid
Fri 08/07 5:50 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 15-31243 [misc,volp11] (1717.00), Amount $1717.00, Receipt 16199608 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
Fri 08/07 5:34 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, With Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By Good Time Stores, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 08/14/2015 (Kirk, E. P.) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Employ
Fri 08/07 5:45 PM
Application to Employ Attorney, E.P. Bud Kirk (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by E. P. Bud Kirk for Debtor Good Time Stores, Inc.(Kirk, E. P.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
17
pgs
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Fri 08/07 6:53 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by E. P. Bud Kirk for Debtor Good Time Stores, Inc.(Kirk, E. P.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |