Jan M. Sensenich et al v. Citizens Bank
Vermont Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Colleen A Brown |
Case #: | 5:15-ap-01030 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Citizens Bank
443 Jefferson Blvd RJW135
Warwick, RI 02886 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jan M. Sensenich
P.O. Box 1326
Norwich, VT 05055 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manyu Lee
P.O. Box 610
Wilmington, VT 05363 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/11 3:30 PM
Adversary Proceeding 5:15-ap-1030 Closed. (Kennedy, Jody USBC-VT) |
||
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC - Order
Fri 07/08 1:23 AM
Certificate of Notice by Bankruptcy Noticing Center Re:9 Default Judgment. Notice Date 07/07/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Default Judgment
Tue 07/05 3:16 PM
Default Judgment. (Kennedy, Jody USBC-VT) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 07/01 11:58 AM
Proposed Order Judgment by Default Filed by Rebecca A Rice on behalf of Manyu Lee Re:5 Application,6 Clerk's Entry of Default. (Rice, Rebecca) |
|
Saturday, January 23, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC - Clerk's Entry of Default
Sun 01/24 1:17 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default and Certificate of Notice by Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Re:6 Clerk's Entry of Default. Notice Date 01/23/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 01/21 9:44 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Citizens Bank Re:5 Application. (Kennedy, Jody USBC-VT) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Application (Generic)
Fri 01/15 1:50 PM
Application for Entry of Default Filed by Rebecca A Rice on behalf of Manyu Lee. (Rice, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC - Summons Issued
Thu 08/13 1:19 AM
Certificate of Notice by Bankruptcy Noticing Center Re:2 Summons with Order on Pre-Trial Deadlines and Scheduling Order Form 7026(f). Notice Date 08/12/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/10 3:30 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Rebecca A Rice on behalf of Manyu Lee Re:1 Complaint,2 Summons with Order on Pre-Trial Deadlines and Scheduling Order Form 7026(f). (Rice, Rebecca) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 08/10 9:21 AM
Summons with Order on Pre-Trial Deadlines and Scheduling Order Form 7026(f) Issued on Citizens Bank Answer Due 9/9/2015. (Kennedy, Jody USBC-VT) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/07 5:00 PM
Adversary case 15-01030 Complaint by Jan M. Sensenich, Manyu Lee against Citizens Bank. Payment Not Due at this Time, Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property) (Rice, Rebecca) |