RNPM, LLC v. Rivera-Eaves et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Francisco A Besosa |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-02081 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 06, 2016 10:53 AM AST |
Defendant
Conjugal partnership Rivera Schoergmayer
|
|
Defendant
Frederick William Rivera-Eaves
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maika Mariel Schoergmayer
|
|
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Schoergmayer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maika Schoergmayer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RNPM, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judgment
Fri 12/02 9:58 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/1/16.(ab) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order
Thu 12/01 11:08 AM
ORDER re32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal: GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/01/2016. (brc) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 11/30 6:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by RNPM, LLC (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 11/21 12:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion Restating Request for Summary Judgment filed by TRM, LLC Re:26 MOTION requesting Order filed by TRM, LLC filed by TRM, LLC. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 11/18 3:35 PM
ORDER re29 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED, but response to motion due by November 21, 2016. The Court just cannot believe that counsel cannot file a short 10-page reply ( see Local Rule 7(c)) and at the same time continue with settlement negotiations. If counsel cannot do both, he's in the wrong business. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/18/2016. (brc) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 11/18 12:04 PM
MOTION for extension of time until 12/05/2016 to Reply to Defendant's Opposition filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/5/2016 (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Sunday, October 16, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Sun 10/16 2:56 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Restating Request for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants Re:26 MOTION requesting Order filed by TRM, LLC filed by All Defendants. (Mendez-Rodriguez, Javier) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Mon 10/03 2:27 PM
ORDER re26 Motion Requesting Order: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/03/2016. (brc) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 09/30 10:36 AM
Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 10/17/2016. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Informative Motion
Wed 07/20 1:59 PM
ORDER re24 Informative Motion: NOTED, but notification will not be held up until after August 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/20/2016. (brc) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Informative Motion
Tue 07/19 1:00 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Attorney Holiday filed by Javier J. Mendez-Rodriguez on behalf of All Defendants Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/5/2016 (Mendez-Rodriguez, Javier) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 06/29 11:21 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion For Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants Re:20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRM, LLC filed by All Defendants.(Mendez-Rodriguez, Javier) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 06/08 6:35 PM
ORDER re21 Motion for Extension of Time to File and Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED. Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Deadline due by June 30, 2016. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/08/2016. (brc) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Document Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 06/08 12:31 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2016 to file Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment , First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2016 to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRM, LLC filed by Javier J. Mendez-Rodriguez on behalf of All Defendants Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/27/2016 (Mendez-Rodriguez, Javier) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 05/24 11:52 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 6/10/2016.(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Statement of Uncontested Material Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 of SUMF- Good Standing Certificate, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 of SUMF- Sworn Statement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 of SUMF- Mortgage Note, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 of SUMF- Mortgage Deed, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 of SUMF- Sworn Title Search, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 of SUMF- Notice of Bankruptcy Filing, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 of SUMF- Bankruptcy Court Discharge Order, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 of SUMF- SCRA Certifications | ||
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Appear Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 01/04 5:37 PM
ORDER re18 Motion for Leave to Appear and Motion for extension of time. Appearance is NOTED. Extension of time is GRANTED. Answer to interrogatories due by January 14, 2016. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/04/2016. (brc) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Appear Extension of Time
Mon 01/04 2:27 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear , First MOTION for extension of time until 01-14-16 to answer Defendants'First Set of Interrogatories filed by Leticia M. Aviles-Matos on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/22/2016 (Aviles-Matos, Leticia) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Informative Motion
Thu 12/17 12:03 PM
ORDER re16 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/17/2015. (brc) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Informative Motion
Thu 12/17 11:24 AM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding loss mitigation filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/4/2016 (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Disclosure
Fri 12/04 11:58 AM
ORDER re14 Motion for Disclosure: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/04/2015. (brc) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Disclosure
Fri 12/04 9:12 AM
MOTION for Disclosure Statement as per FRCP 7.1 filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/21/2015 (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Informative Motion
Mon 11/16 5:18 PM
ORDER re11 Informative Motion: NOTED and GRANTED. Results of evaluation due by December 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/16/2015. (brc) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 11/16 4:55 PM
RESPONSE in Support of Informative Motion Requesting Extension of Time filed by All Defendants Re:11 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding loss mitigation filed by RNPM, LLC filed by All Defendants. (Mendez-Rodriguez, Javier) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Informative Motion
Mon 11/16 4:10 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding loss mitigation filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/3/2015 (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 10/20 11:09 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Presenting Defenses Under Rule 12(b) filed by Javier J. Mendez-Rodriguez on behalf of Defendants Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Schoergmayer, Frederick William Rivera-Eaves, Maika Schoergmayer.(Mendez-Rodriguez, Javier) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 10/09 2:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RNPM, LLC upon (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 10/05 1:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RNPM, LLC upon Frederick William Rivera-Eaves served on 9/7/2015, answer due 9/28/2015. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 10/05 1:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RNPM, LLC upon Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Schoergmayer served on 9/7/2015, answer due 9/28/2015. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 10/05 1:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RNPM, LLC upon Maika Schoergmayer served on 9/7/2015, answer due 9/28/2015. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
misc
Notice of Docket Text Modification
Tue 10/06 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:7 Summons Returned Executed.***FILED IN ERROR. Wrong pdf. Missing proof of service.*** (ab) |
||
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 09/23 5:14 PM
ORDER re4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline due by 10/28/2015. No additional extensions of time will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/23/2015. (brc) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 09/23 4:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until October 28, 2015 to File Answer Notice of Appearance re:1 Complaint, filed by RNPM, LLC filed by Javier J. Mendez-Rodriguez on behalf of All Defendants Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2015 (Mendez-Rodriguez, Javier) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/11 10:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Conjugal partnership Rivera Schoergmayer, Frederick William Rivera-Eaves, Maika Mariel Schoergmayer (arg) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 08/11 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/10 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-4526213.), filed by RNPM, LLC. Service due by 12/11/2015,(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Mortgage note, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Mortgage Deed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Title Search, | ||
Att: 4 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons |