Black Elk Energy Offshore Operations, LLC and Wood Group PSN, Inc.
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:15-bk-34287 |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Oct 19, 2015 |
Converted: | Sep 01, 2015 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jul 13, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Black Elk Energy Offshore Operations, LLC
3100 S. Gessner, Ste. 215
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Nov 20, 2015 4:55 PM CST |
Attorney
Kevin R. Pennell
Zukowski, Bresenhan, Sinex & Petry, LLP 1177 West Loop South, Suite 1100
Houston, TX 77027 |
|
Creditor
Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Adams and Reese LLP 701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500
New Orleans, LA 70139 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PDI Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Moores Pump & Services, Inc.
105 Derrick Road
Broussard, LA 70518 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TKN Petroleum Offshore LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montco Offshore, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Merit Energy Company, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
McMoran Oil & Gas, LLC
Locke Lord LLP Omer F. Kuebel, III Bradley C. Knapp 601 Poydras St., Suite 2660
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Guy Matthews
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carolyn Matthews
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
JAB Energy Solutions, L.L.C.
Snow Spence Green LLP c/o Ken Green & Carolyn Carollo 2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Martin Holdings, LLC
Phelps Dunbar LLP 100 South Ashley Drive, Suite 1900
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tefsco, LLC
Zukowski, Bresenhan, Sinex & Petry, LLP Kevin Pennell 1177 West Loop South, Suite 1100
Houston, TX 77027 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
|
Creditor
Stephen G. Lawrence
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kevin Gros Consulting & Marine, Inc.
Harris & Rufty, LLC 650 Poydras Street, Ste. 2710
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Katy Freeway Investors, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thru Tubing Solutions
8032 Main Street
Houma, LA 70360 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Island Operating Company, Inc.
770 S. Post Oak Lane Suite 400
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Robin Instrument & Specialty, LLC
205 North Luke Street
Lafayette, LA 70506 |
|
Creditor
Stric-Lan Companies, LLC
104 Sable Street
Duson, LA 70529 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
State of Louisiana, Department of Natural Resources, Office of Mineral Resources
617 North Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shell Offshore Inc.
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP c/o Bill Greendyke 1301 McKinney Street, Suite 5100
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shamrock Management, LLC
Scofield Gerard Pohorelsky Gallaugher & Landry 901 Lakeshore Drive, Ste. 900
Lake Charles, LA 70601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Settoon Towing LLC
1073 Hwy. 70
Pierre Part, LA 70339 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Securities And Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sea Horse Marine Inc.
i601 Poydras Street Suite 2775
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
SM Energy Company
Thompson & Knight LLP 333 Clay St., Suite 3300
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Peregrine Oil & Gas II, LLC
Three Riverway Suite 1750
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Quality Process Services, LLC
292A Equity Boulevard
Houma, LA 70361 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Quality Construction & Production, L.L.C.
425 Griffin Road
Youngsville, LA 70592 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Process Piping Materials Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Platinum Partners Value Arbitrage Fund LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Platinum Partners Liquid Opportunities Master Fund LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Phoenix Investment Adviser, LLC
420 Lexington Ave. Suite 2040
New York, NY 10170 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Peregrine Oil & Gas, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alta Mesa Holdings, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harrison, Bettis, Staff, McFarland, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
C-Port/Stone, LLC
Phelps Dunbar LLP 100 South Ashley Drive, Suite 1900
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Black Elk Management, LLC
1401 McKinney, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Becnel Rental Tools, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
David Baker
Excalibur Energy LLC 1350 Avenue of the Americas 2nd Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
|
Creditor
Aspen American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Argonaut Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thomas G. Andrus
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cairn Energy USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ABS Consulting Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WFS Liquids LLC
Hall, Estill, et al. 320 South Boston Avenue Suite 200
Tulsa, OK 74103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Weatherford U.S., L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
White Marlin Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Williams Field Services-Gulf Coast Company LP
Hall, Estill, et al. 320 South Boston Avenue Suite 200
Tulsa, OK 74103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Williams Gulf Coast Gathering Company, LLC
Hall, Estill, et al. 320 South Boston Avenue Suite 200
Tulsa, OK 74103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Williams Mobile Bay Producer Services LLC
Hall, Estill, et al. 320 South Boston Avenue Suite 200
Tulsa, OK 74103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jolene M Wise
175 W Jackson Blvd Suite 900 Securities and Exhange Commission
Chicago, IL 60604 |
|
Creditor
Terry Clark
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carl Hammond
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gulf Crane Services, Inc.
Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C. 1601 Elm St. Suite 4600
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GRAND ISLE SHIPYARDS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Hall, Estill, et al. 320 South Boston Avenue Suite 200
Tulsa, OK 74103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fieldwood Energy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ecoserv, LLC
207 Town Center Parkway, 2nd Floor
Lafayette, LA 70506 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
EXLP Operating, L.L.C.
16666 North Chase Dr.
Houston, TX 77060 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ECCO Electrical & Instrumentation, Inc.
|
|
Creditor
United Rentals (North America), Inc
Matthews, Shiels, Pearce, LLP 8131 LBJ Freeway, Suite 700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Diamond Oil Field Supply, Inc.
|
|
Creditor
Venice Energy Services and Venice Gathering System
c/o Patti Prewitt 10953 Vista Lake Ct.
Navasota, TX 77868 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deepwater Corrosion Services, Inc.
3900 Essex Lane Suite 800
Houston, TX 77027 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
W&T Offshore Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ConocoPhillips Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Ad Hoc Committee of Secured Noteholders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Edna Tajonera
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Maritech Resources, LLC
Porter Hedges LLP 1000 Main Street, 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JX Nippon Oil Exploration (U.S.A.) Limited
5151 SAN FELIPE, SUITE 750
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Furth Oil Co.
Nathan Sommers Jacobs, P.C. 2800 Post Oak Blvd., 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Douglas S. Draper
Heller Draper Patrick Horn & Dabney, LLC 650 Poydras Street Suite 2500
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Department of Justice
P.O. Bx #375, Ben Franklin Station 1100 L. Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20044 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Dauphin Island Gathering Partners
JACKSON WALKER LLP 1401 McKinney Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Laredo Construction Inc.
13385 Murphy Road
Stafford, TX 77477 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Ryan Marine Services, Inc.
7500 Harborside Drive
Galveston, TX 77554 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Gulf Offshore Logistics, LLC
4535 Highway 308
Raceland, LA 70394 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
The Grand Ltd.
3900 Causeway Blvd., Siote 1470
Metarie, LA 70002 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Trustee of the Black Elk Litigation Trust, Richard Schmidt, Trustee
Okin & Adams, LLP 1113 Vine St Suite 201
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2489 | 2489
misc
Operating Report - Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation
Wed 04/17 4:29 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 12/31/2023 (Filed By Richard Schmidt ). (Sparacino, John) |
|
2488 | 2488
misc
Operating Report - Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation
Wed 04/17 4:23 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 12/31/2023 (Filed By Richard Schmidt ). (Sparacino, John) |
|
2487 | 2487
misc
Operating Report - Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation
Wed 04/17 4:09 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 9/30/2023 (Filed By Richard Schmidt ). (Sparacino, John) |
|
2486 | 2486
misc
Operating Report - Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation
Wed 04/17 4:04 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ended 9/30/2023 (Filed By Richard Schmidt ). (Sparacino, John) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/11 1:55 PM
Adversary Case 4:18-ap-3201 Closed. (tjl4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/11 2:05 PM
Adversary Case 4:18-ap-3386 Closed. (tjl4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/11 2:12 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3330 Closed. (tjl4) |