Robson v. Colvin
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Nathanael M Cousins |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-03652 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:402 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2016 |
Defendant
Nancy A. Berryhill
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard H. Robson
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 10/23 2:02 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to38 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Richard H. Robson (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 08/30 4:07 PM
USCA MEMORANDUM as to38 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Richard H. Robson AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
Appellants Brief
Wed 10/26 11:11 AM
Appellant's BRIEF Appellee Brief due by 11/2/2016. (Robson, Richard) (Filed on 10/26/2016) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 10/26 1:24 PM
Electronic filing error. Please file brief with the US Court of Appeals. Thank you. [err401] Re:40 Appellant's Brief (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016) |
||
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 10/04 1:13 PM
USCA Scheduling Order for USCA Case Number 16-16771 US Court of Appeals, 9th Circuit for38 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Richard H. Robson. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016) |
|
38 | 38
appeal
Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit
Mon 10/03 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals by Richard H. Robson. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-10817198. Appeal Record due by 11/2/2016. (Robson, Richard) (Filed on 10/3/2016) Modified text to match docket entry on 10/3/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 10/03 9:57 AM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Notice of Appeal. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:38 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Richard H. Robson (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016) |
||
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
order
Judgment Terminate Civil Case
Wed 09/07 8:50 PM
JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's September 7, 2016, order denying Robson's motions for reconsideration, summary judgment, sanctions and to amend the complaint, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff with respect to all claims asserted in the complaint. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/7/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion for Sanctions
Wed 09/07 4:31 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; DENYING MOTION FOR DISCOVERY. Re: Dkt. Nos. 24 27 34 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Thu 06/16 1:42 PM
REPLY filed byRichard H. Robson. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Pretrial Memorandum
Wed 06/15 12:13 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM -Plaintiff Seeking Leave to Proceed with Discover by Richard H. Robson. (Robson, Richard) (Filed on 6/15/2016) Modified on 6/15/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Sunday, June 12, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Sun 06/12 12:39 PM
REPLY filed byRichard H. Robson. (Robson, Richard) (Filed on 6/12/2016) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Case Management Conference - Further
Thu 06/02 3:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Case Management Conference held on 6/1/2016: Plaintiff to file reply to his motion for reconsideration by 6/13; No other briefs are to be filed without leave of Court. Plaintiff Richard Robson. Defendant's Attorney: Patrick Snyder. (FTR Time 11:26am - 12:10pm.) This is a text only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/1/2016) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 06/02 10:43 AM
DOCKETED IN ERROR PLEASE DISREGARD; DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY #27. MOTION for Termination Sanctions and Motion Maximum Disciplinary Sanctions and Reset of Process to Granting of Motions, Judgments & Orders of Plaintiff's requests of 4/29/15 filed by Richard H. Robson. Responses due by 6/15/2016. Replies due by 6/22/2016. (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016) Modified on 6/2/2016 (srn, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Tue 05/31 5:19 PM
RESPONSE Opposing Reconsideration filed byCarolyn W. Colvin. (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 5/31/2016) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 05/25 4:05 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING the hearing set for 6/3/2016 at 10:00 AM re Motion for Sanctions Termination of Defence filed by Richard H. Robson27 . The Court will address the motion at the 6/1/2016 Case Management Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016) |
|
28 | 28
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 05/25 1:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cousins. Parties are to appear in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Sanctions
Wed 05/25 9:04 AM
MOTION for Sanctions Termination of Defence filed by Richard H. Robson. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 6/8/2016. Replies due by 6/15/2016. (Robson, Richard) (Filed on 5/25/2016) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Affidavit
Mon 05/23 3:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Richard H. Robson.(Robson, Richard) (Filed on 5/23/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix prev not uploaded, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix prev not uploaded | ||
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 05/17 1:39 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant to respond to Robson's motion for reconsideration24 within 14 days. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 05/17 8:32 AM
First MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Richard H. Robson.(Robson, Richard) (Filed on 5/17/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix | ||
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 05/10 2:59 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Re: Dkt. No. 22 . Robson's renewed summary judgment motion is due by 5/27/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Summary Judgment
Fri 04/29 2:08 PM
Response to Defendant Answer and Egregious Defendant Attorney(s) Conduct/Violations of Court Procedure, Motion to Estop Defendant from all further Actions on Defense of this Case, Motion to Re-classify as Class Action and , MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard H. Robson. Responses due by 5/3/2016. Responses due by 5/27/2016. Replies due by 6/10/2016.(Robson, Richard) (Filed on 4/29/2016) Modified on 4/29/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix case law citations, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix case law citations, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix case law citations | ||
Tuesday, April 12, 2016 | ||
utility
Remark
Tue 04/12 10:33 AM
Received chambers copy of administrative record (20 ); placed on shelf in clerk's office. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016) |
||
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
misc
SSA Administrative Transcript
Mon 04/11 10:45 AM
SSA Administrative Transcript Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Administrative Record in Paper and Electronic Form by Carolyn W. Colvin.(Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 4/11/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Part 2 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/11 9:09 AM
ANSWER to Complaint byCarolyn W. Colvin. (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 4/11/2016) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Order on Motion to Strike
Thu 03/31 11:19 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION; AND MOTION TO STRIKE. Re: Dkt. Nos. 10 17 18 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Strike
Fri 03/25 1:25 PM
MOTION to Strike17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Meeting in Judge's Chambers filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. Responses due by 4/8/2016. Replies due by 4/15/2016. (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 3/25/2016) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Thu 03/24 12:15 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Meeting in Judge's Chambers filed by Richard H. Robson. Responses due by 3/28/2016.(Robson, Richard) (Filed on 3/24/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Talbert/Snyder Emails | ||
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Tue 03/08 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Patrick William Snyder (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 3/8/2016) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 02/16 12:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer 12 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 02/11 3:57 PM
RESPONSE opposing Motion for Extension filed byRichard H. Robson.(Robson, Richard) (Filed on 2/11/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Offer to Resolve, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement e-dialogue with Def Counsel, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement e-dialogue with Def Counsel | ||
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 02/10 9:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff shall file an opposition or statement of non opposition to the motion to extend time12 by 2/12/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 02/10 12:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. (Talbert, Daniel) (Filed on 2/10/2016) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/09 3:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carolyn W. Colvin.. (Talbert, Daniel) (Filed on 2/9/2016) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 01/19 11:28 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard H. Robson. Responses due by 2/16/2016. Replies due by 3/1/2016.(Robson, Richard) (Filed on 1/19/2016) |
|
Att: 1 plaintiff offer to resolve, | ||
Att: 2 supporting letter REP K. Brady | ||
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Wed 09/23 3:13 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Social Security Administration, Office of the General Counsel on 9/23/2015. Waiver of Service due by 10/23/2015.(srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015) |
|
Att: 1 waiver | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 09/23 3:21 PM
Mailed Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, two copies of the Waiver of Service of Summons, a copy of the complaint and all attachments thereto, a magistrate judge consent form and a copy of the Order of Service (8 ) sent to the Social Security Administration, Office of the General Counsel, 160 Spear Street Ste. 800, San Francisco, CA 94105. A courtesy copy of the complaint and all the attachments thereto and Order of Service (8 ) mailed to US Attorney's Office, 450 Golden Gate Ave., PO Box 36055, San Francisco, CA 94102. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015) |
||
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order of Service
Tue 09/22 1:38 PM
ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/22/2015. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) (sms, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (9/22/2015) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 08/12 3:15 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff must file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/26/2015. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Wed 08/12 3:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS 2 AND GRANTING ELECTRONIC ACCESS 3 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Social Security Procedural Order
Wed 08/12 10:38 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015) (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Wed 08/12 10:33 AM
MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Richard H. Robson.(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/12 10:31 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Richard H. Robson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/12/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/11 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT (no process) IFP pending against Carolyn W. Colvin. Filed by Richard H. Robson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015) (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (8/11/2015) Civil Cover Sheet |