Juliana, et al v United States of America, et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Ann L Aiken |
Case #: | 6:15-cv-01517 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 12, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 08, 2016 3:59 AM PST |
Amicus
Global Catholic Climate Movement and Leadership Council of Women Religious
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Holdren
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Penny Pritzker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Office of the President of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barack Obama
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ernest Moniz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gina McCarthy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Agriculture
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Commerce
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Defense
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Energy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Kerry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Interior
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sally Jewell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Transportation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christy Goldfuss
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Environmental Protection Agency
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Foxx
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas J. Vilsack
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shaun Donovan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ashton Carter
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
American Petroleum Institute
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
The National Association of Manufacturers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hazel V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaime B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathaniel B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zealand B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Levi D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Journey Z.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earth Guardians
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sahara V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miko V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isaac V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aji P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jayden F.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Future Generations
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tia Marie Hatton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelsey Cascadia Rose Juliana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sophie K.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Lebel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Loznak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Avery M.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xiuhtezcatl Tonatiuh M.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kiran Isaac Oommen
|
Represented By
|
1. | The climate change lawsuit that could stop the U.S. government from supporting fossil fuels (cbsnews.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/05/2019 | |
2. | Children Change The Climate In The US Supreme Court -- 1st Climate Lawsuit Goes Forward (forbes.com) |
Submitted Fri 08/03/2018 | |
3. | These fossil-fuel groups file motion to withdraw from Child's Climate Change Lawsuit (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Tue 05/30/2017 | |
4. | President Trump Named As Defendant In Youths Activist's Lawsuit Over Climate Change (opb.org) |
Submitted Fri 02/10/2017 | |
5. | Federal judge rejects government?s arguments, sides with youth plaintiffs in climate lawsuit (registerguard.com) |
Submitted Fri 11/11/2016 | |
6. | Youth's Climate Change Suit Allowed to Proceed (teslarati.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/11/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
598 | 598
13
pgs
order
Opinion and Order
Fri 04/19 3:32 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons explained, defendants' motion for a stay, ECF No.571 , is DENIED. This Court shall address defendants' Petition for Writ of Mandamus with this order. Signed on 4/19/2024 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) |
|
597 | 597
15
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/19 3:14 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER ADDRESSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS: This Court has great regard for the judicial process. It has deliberately considered all motions the parties brought, and its decisions are accessible for appellate scrutiny in the due course of litigation. Trial courts across the country address complex cases involving similar jurisdictional, evidentiary, and legal questions as those presented here without resorting to interlocutory appeal or petitioning for a writ of mandamus. As Justice Stewart noted, "the proper place for the trial is in the trial court, not here." Baker v. Carr , 369 U.S. 186, 266 (1962) (Stewart, J., concurring.) Defendants therefore have other means, such as a direct appeal, to obtain the desired relief. This Court recommends denying defendants' petition for writ of mandamus. Signed on 4/19/2024 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
596 | 596
notice
Attorney Substitution
Wed 04/17 4:13 PM
Notice of Attorney Substitution: Stanford Purser is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Christopher Bates . Filed by on behalf of State of Utah. (Purser, Stanford) |