BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT v. Z.B.
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stewart Dalzell |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-04604 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 10, 2016 10:42 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Z.B.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Z.B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 12, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Tue 04/12 1:37 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES' JOINT LETTER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PARAGRAPH 4 OF OUR 1/14/2016 ORDER IS VACATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 4/12/16. 4/12/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Mon 02/29 10:54 AM
ORDER THAT PARAGRAPH 1 OF OUR JANUARY 27, 2016 ORDER IS AMENDED TO PROVIDE THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ANY MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES BY NOON ON APRIL 11, 2016 AND PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ANY OPPOSITION THERETO BY NOON ON APRIL 25, 2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 2/29/16. 2/29/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
Tue 01/26 3:53 PM
Joint Stipulation for an Extension of Time (ti, ) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 01/26 3:39 PM
ORDER THAT PARAGRAPH 4 OF THE 1/14/2016 ORDER IS AMENDED TO PROVIDE THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ANY MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES BY NOON ON 2/29/2016. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL DOCKET THE ATTACHED STIPULATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 1/27/16. 1/26/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/14 4:21 PM
ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT Z.B., BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, K.B. AND R.B. AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 1/14/16. 1/14/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Thu 01/14 4:19 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD12 IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD13 IS DENIED; THE HEARING OFFICER'S DECISION OF 5/18/2015 IS UPHELD; DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ANY MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES BY NOON ON 1/28/2016, AND PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ANY OPPOSITION THERETO BY NOON ON 2/8/2016; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE STATISTICALLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 1/14/16. 1/14/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
16 | 16
31
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Thu 01/14 4:15 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 1/14/16. 1/14/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 11/19 1:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION for Judgment On The Administrative Record filed by BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT.(AMUSO, PETER) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/18 11:15 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by Z.B.. (WEINER, CHARLES) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Judgment
Fri 11/06 11:02 AM
MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(AMUSO, PETER) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
12 | 12
motion
Judgment
Fri 11/06 9:54 AM
MOTION for Judgment On The Administrative Record filed by Z.B...(WEINER, CHARLES) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Administrative Record
Thu 11/05 4:25 PM
Administrative Record. (ti, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 10/14 4:07 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO FILE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD UNDER SEAL, THE CLERK IS DIRECTED THAT, UPON RECEIPT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD FROM THE OFFICE OF DISPUTE RESOLUTION, THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 10/14/15. 10/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
Tue 10/13 10:06 AM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to File Administrative Record Under Seal by Z.B..(WEINER, CHARLES) Modified on 10/13/2015 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR, FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 10/09 1:00 PM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD BY NOON ON 11/6/2015, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL ON 10/8/15. 10/9/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
7 | 7
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 10/09 12:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL Pretrial Conference held on 10/8/15 (ti, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 09/29 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/8/2015 AT 1:30 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 15613, BEFORE THE HONORABLE STEWART DALZELL.(ea, ) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Response
Tue 09/29 11:41 AM
Response to Defedants' Counterclaim re4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT. (AMUSO, PETER) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 09/09 11:23 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint, together with with Affirmative Defenses and , COUNTERCLAIM against BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT by Z.B..(WEINER, CHARLES) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/04 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES WEINER on behalf of Z.B. (WEINER, CHARLES) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 09/01 1:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT. Z.B. waiver sent on 8/20/2015, answer due 10/19/2015. (AMUSO, PETER) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/14 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Z.B. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 126047.), filed by BRISTOL TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT.(pod, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/14 2:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Z.B.. One Given To: Counsel on 8/14/15 (pod, ) |