Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:15-cv-02675
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2015
Last checked: Friday Feb 12, 2016 7:42 AM CST
Defendant
7-Eleven, Inc.
1722 Routh Street, Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75201
Defendant
7-Eleven Inc
Represented By
Molly B Cowan
Hallett & Perrin PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gulnar Thawar
Represented By
Wade A Forsman
Law Offices Of Wade A Forsman
contact info

GPO Feb 29 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS 7-11's 5 Motion to Dismiss with respect to Thawar's COBRA, battery, and negligent misrepresentation claims, and DENIES it with respect to her conversion and negligence claims. The Court further GRANTS Thawar leave to amend her complaint with respect to her COBRA and battery claims on or before 3/11/2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 2/29/2016) (ran)

Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM CST
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
54 54 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 4:44 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting53 Motion to Extend Time. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Designate Rebuttal Experts. Plaintiff's rebuttal expert designation now due forty days after Defendant's designations and disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2)(B). (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/10/2017) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
53 53 motion Extension of Time Mon 11:22 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Designate Rebuttal Experts filed by Gulnar Thawar (Spencer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
52 52 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 10:16 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting50 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah M. Tudor. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/3/2017) (chmb)
Related: [-]