Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. LOreal USA, Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01416 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 13, 2016 7:51 AM CST |
Counter Claimant
LOreal USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Lennon Image Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LOreal USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Mike Patterson
Mike Patterson Mediation 515 South Vine
Tyler, TX 75702 |
|
Plaintiff
Lennon Image Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Wed 03/09 5:44 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 03/09 5:39 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/09/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Dismiss
Tue 03/08 4:51 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/08 3:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal re LOreal USA, Inc. by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 02/17 9:16 AM
ORDER granting36 Motion to Stay All Deadlines between Plaintiff Lennon Image Technologies, LLC and Defendant LOral USA, Inc.s. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/16/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Stay
Fri 02/12 5:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 01/19 11:07 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re17 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination PLAINTIFF LENNON IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT L'OREAL USA, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATION filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC .(Buether, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Eric W. Buether, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 23 to Buether Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 24 to Buether Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 25 to Buether Declaration | ||
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Protective Order
Wed 01/13 8:30 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/12/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 01/08 3:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order re13 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 01/08 2:32 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:26 Reply to Response to Motion..(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit J-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit J-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit J-3 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 01/08 2:28 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:26 Reply to Response to Motion..(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit F-4, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit F-5, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit F-6 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 01/08 2:26 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:26 Reply to Response to Motion..(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit F-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit F-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit F-3 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 01/08 2:21 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:26 Reply to Response to Motion..(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit N | ||
28 | 28
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 01/08 2:19 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:26 Reply to Response to Motion..(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit L | ||
27 | 27
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 01/08 2:12 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:26 Reply to Response to Motion..(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit I | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 01/08 1:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by LOreal USA, Inc. .(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit E | ||
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 12/28 7:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Plaintiff Lennon Image Technologies, LLC's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC .(Buether, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Niky Bukovcan, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 24 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 12/23 4:12 PM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/23/15. (mrm, ) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Scheduling Order
Wed 12/23 4:12 PM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2016., Jury Selection set for 3/6/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 7/29/2016., Markman Hearing set for 7/1/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 1/20/2017., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2017.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/23/2015. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/22 1:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order re13 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/22 1:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order re13 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Referring Case to Mediator
Fri 12/11 4:27 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Mike Patterson is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/11/2015. (nkl, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Designation of Mediator
Wed 12/09 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Mike Patterson, filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Wed 12/09 1:55 PM
DEFICIENT DOCUMENT Additional Attachments to Main Document:17 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination .. (Smith, Michael) Modified on 12/9/2015 (nkl, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 12/09 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Additional Attachments to Main Document submitted document18 a proposed order should not be filed on the docket as a separate entry. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, ) |
||
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stay
Tue 12/08 8:57 AM
MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination by LOreal USA, Inc..(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Fri 12/11 11:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 12/8/15. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml) |
||
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 12/07 5:50 PM
ANSWER to14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 11/13 7:59 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, ) |
||
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 11/12 4:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LOreal USA, Inc. (Smith, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 11/12 4:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Lennon Image Technologies, LLC by LOreal USA, Inc..(Smith, Michael) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/02 8:28 AM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2015 01:30 PM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/01/2015. (nkl, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 10/28 9:19 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2015. (nkl, ) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Wed 10/28 9:20 AM
Answer Due Deadline Updated for LOreal USA, Inc. to 11/12/2015. (nkl, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 10/20 10:14 AM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by LOreal USA, Inc..(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 09/25 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel R Leeman on behalf of LOreal USA, Inc. (Leeman, Joel) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 09/25 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa M Tittemore on behalf of LOreal USA, Inc. (Tittemore, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/22 9:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC for LOreal USA, Inc. (nkl, ) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Mon 09/21 4:15 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LOreal USA, Inc..( Smith, Michael) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Mon 09/21 4:52 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LOreal USA, Inc. to 10/21/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) |
||
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/20 4:37 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to LOreal USA, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company Registered Agent. (nkl, ) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 08/20 3:53 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Thu 08/20 3:54 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, ) |
||
Monday, August 17, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/17 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/17 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Buether, Eric) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 08/17 2:34 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/17 2:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Joe, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/17 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against LOreal USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5344727.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC.(Joe, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 6,624,843 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Claim Chart, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |