Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Camille L Velez-Rive
Referred: Camille L Velez-Rive
Case #: 3:15-cv-02140
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2015
Terminated:Jan 25, 2018
Last checked: Monday Feb 15, 2016 8:26 AM AST
Defendant
Dr. Mabel Bonilla Rodriguez
Defendant
Conjugal Partenership of Dr. Miguel Suarez Villamil and Jane Doe Suarez
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership of Dr. Laura Puig Marrero and John Doe Puig
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership of Mabel Bonilla Rodriguez and John Doe Bonilla
Defendant
Hospital Buen Samaritano
Represented By
Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez
contact info
Roselli Ciena-Malave
contact info
Defendant
Hospital de la Concepcion
Represented By
Reinaldo Calderon-Jimenez
Calderon & Arroyo Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Laura S. Puig Marrero
Defendant
Dr. Miguel Suarez Villamil
Defendant
Mabel M. Bonilla-Rodriguez
Represented By
Juan M. Masini-Soler
Juan Masini Soler Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Mabel M. Bonilla-Rodriguez
Defendant
Conjugal Parnership Suarez-Doe
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Doe-Bonilla
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership of Doe-Puig
Defendant
Laura S. Puig-Marrero
Represented By
Igor Dominguez-Perez
Igor J. Dominguez Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Miguel Suarez-Villamil
Represented By
Sigrid Lopez-Gonzalez
Sigrid Lopez Gonzalez Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Cyd Marie Cordero Paredes
Represented By
Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon
Rafael E. Garcia Rodon Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Markus Rivera Cordero
Represented By
Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon
Rafael E. Garcia Rodon Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Osvaldo Rivera Roman
Represented By
Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon
Rafael E. Garcia Rodon Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
M.R.C.
Represented By
Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon
Rafael E. Garcia Rodon Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Markus Rivera-Cordero
Represented By
Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon
Rafael E. Garcia Rodon Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Osvaldo Rivera-Roman
Represented By
Rafael E. Garcia-Rodon
Rafael E. Garcia Rodon Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/14/2022 11:59 PM AST
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
269 269 motion Restrict Tue 07/19 8:00 AM
MOTION to Restrict Document Notice of Filing Trustee Acc. filed by Floyd Faglie on behalf of Cyd Marie Cordero Paredes Responses due by 8/2/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Faglie, Floyd)
Related: [-]
268 268 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/19 7:58 AM
***EX-PARTE*** NOTICE of Filing Trustee Accounting by Cyd Marie Cordero Paredes (Faglie, Floyd)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Restrict Tue 07/19 8:53 AM
ORDER granting269 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 07/19/2022. (cvr)
Related: [-]