Stone v. Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ivan Lr Lemelle |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-03638 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 15, 2016 5:29 AM CST |
Defendant
Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The ABC Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Nova Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unidentified Party
|
|
Defendant
New Orleans City
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patty Stone
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 08 2015
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (jrc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2015: # (1) Letter) (jrc). |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Tue 12/08 5:25 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (jrc) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/23 1:29 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC, Nova Casualty Company re21 First MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Clayman, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 11/20 10:10 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, as to New Orleans City as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (ijg) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 11/19 2:55 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by New Orleans City.Attorney Derek M. Mercadal added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Mercadal, Derek) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 11/10 6:16 PM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Patty Stone. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/2/2015.(Mullin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission | ||
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 11/04 2:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 11/3/2015, answer due 11/24/2015. (Mullin, Michael) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 10/30 4:17 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint,16 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint,16 Amended Complaint by Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC, Nova Casualty Company.Attorney Jeffrey A. Clayman added to party Nova Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Clayman, Jeffrey) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/30 12:01 PM
Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (mmm) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
service
Request for Summons Issued
Thu 10/29 2:02 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to New Orleans City filed by All Plaintiffs re16 Amended Complaint.(Mullin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Complaint | ||
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/26 12:30 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC, Nova Casualty Company, New Orleans City filed by Patty Stone.(bwn) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 10/26 12:28 PM
ORDER ON MOTION re12 Motion to Amend: Granted as unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North. (bwn) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
Thu 10/15 12:53 PM
ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT on12 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Amended Complaint for 10/28/2015 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North.(bwn) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 10/13 10:31 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re12 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Amended Complaint ; Motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael North. No further action is required. (ijg) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 10/09 5:57 PM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Amended Complaint by Patty Stone. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/28/2015.(Mullin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendant's answers to interrogatories, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Submission | ||
11 | 11
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 10/09 5:32 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Amended Complaint by Patty Stone. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/28/2015.(Mullin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendant's answers to interrogatories, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Submission | ||
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/17 12:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2016 10:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Jury Trial set for 6/6/2016 08:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 4/19/2016. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle.(ijg) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form | ||
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 09/11 5:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Nova Casualty Company on 9/11/2015, answer due 11/10/2015. (Mullin, Michael) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Amendment/Supplement to Document
Fri 09/04 3:36 PM
Amendment/Supplement to Document by Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC re7 Notice of Compliance with State Court Return of Service(Clayman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, September 03, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Compliance
Thu 09/03 8:07 PM
Notice of Compliance with 28 USC 1447 by Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC re3 Order.(Clayman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 09/02 1:13 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiff, Patty Stone against Nova Casualty Company filed by Patty Stone.(Mullin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Summons to Nova Casualty | ||
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Set Hearings
Fri 08/28 11:15 AM
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2015 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ijg) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal
Wed 08/26 9:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC.(Clayman, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 08/20 4:09 PM
ORDER re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC. Signed by Clerk.(ijg) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 08/20 1:32 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (mmv) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 08/19 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2015-6012 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4986802) filed by Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC.Attorney Jeffrey A. Clayman added to party Arts Center Enterprises - New Orleans, LLC(pty:dft).(Clayman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |