Ibrahim Fahra v. Lynch et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James T Trimble, Jr |
Referred: | Joseph H L Perez-Montes |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-02213 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 15, 2016 6:33 AM CST |
Defendant
David C Cole
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeh Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Loretta Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alice M Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sarah Saldana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abdulhakim Ibrahim Fahra
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 05/05 3:03 PM
JUDGMENT ; adopting Report and Recommendations re14 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that Fabra's habeas petition is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/5/16. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case
Tue 05/03 9:09 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James T Trimble, Jr. Chief Judge Dee D Drell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 5/1/2016. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/22 11:20 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Abdulhakim Ibrahim Fahra,12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alice M Miller, Jeh Johnson, Loretta Lynch, David C Cole, Sarah Saldana. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Respondents' Motion to Dismiss [doc. 12] be GRANTED and that Fahra's Habeas petition be DENIED AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 4/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 03/21/16. (crt,Tice, Y)(b) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Motion Setting (without date)
Mon 03/14 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 03/11 5:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by David C Cole, Jeh Johnson, Loretta Lynch, Alice M Miller, Sarah Saldana. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes.(aty,Walker, Cristina) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Declaration | ||
Monday, December 21, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 12/21 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Magistrate Judge James D Kirk no longer assigned to case. Any motion and/or proceeding currently set before Magistrate Judge James D Kirk is hereby reset before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. All future pleadings shall reflect the current judge assignment. Issued by Tony R Moore, Clerk. (crt,Brown, A) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Response in Support (NOT Motions)
Mon 11/23 7:27 PM
RESPONSE in Support of Petition of Habeas Corpus by Abdulhakim Ibrahim Fahra re6 Response to Habeas Petition, .(aty,Trostle, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Supp Ex. A, Affidavit of Tayiba Dima, | ||
Att: 2 Supp. Ex. B, Copy of Mr. Fahras Travel Document Request, | ||
Att: 3 Supp. Ex. C, Email to Embassy of Ethiopia, | ||
Att: 4 Supp. Ex. D, Embassy of Ethiopia Passport and Identification Document Pages | ||
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 11/10 10:40 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney General. Date of Delivery 11/6/2015. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Wed 11/04 11:29 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to US Attorney General and Warden LaSalle Detention Facility. Served on 10/30/2015, answer due 1/2/2015. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
7 | 7
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 11/03 3:30 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to District Director ICE. Date of Delivery 10/30/2015. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Wed 10/28 12:57 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by David C Cole, Jeh Johnson, Loretta Lynch, Alice M Miller, Sarah Saldana.(Attorney Cristina Walker added to party David C Cole(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina Walker added to party Jeh Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina Walker added to party Alice M Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Cristina Walker added to party Sarah Saldana(pty:dft))(aty,Walker, Cristina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Declaration | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 10/28 12:02 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warden LaSalle Detention Facility, District Director ICE, U S Attorney and U S Attorney General.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Certified mail receipts | ||
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Sec P - Service Order
Wed 10/28 9:57 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on 10/27/2015. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/22 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Walker on behalf of Loretta Lynch (Attorney Cristina Walker added to party Loretta Lynch(pty:dft)) (aty,Walker, Cristina) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - USA (Form Included)
Wed 08/19 3:05 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Loretta Lynch, Jeh Johnson, Sarah Saldana, Alice M Miller, David C Cole. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 08/19 12:22 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0536-2871398) filed by Abdulhakim Ibrahim Fahra.(Attorney Emily Christine Trostle added to party Abdulhakim Ibrahim Fahra(pty:pet))(aty,Trostle, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed summons/writ, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. A, Notice to Appear, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. B, Statement of Mr. Fahra, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. C, Immigration Judges Decision, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. D, March 26, 2015 Decision to Continue Detention, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. E, July 15, 2015 Decision to Continue Detention | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/19 3:00 PM
CASE Assigned to Chief Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge James D Kirk. (crt,Thigpen, M) |