Masini v. Siemens Industry, Inc. et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Victor A Bolden |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-01249 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 16, 2016 7:05 AM EST |
Defendant
NESC Staffing, Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Siemens Industry, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michele Masini
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Thu 03/31 11:27 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.) |
||
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/30 12:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The parties have reported that they have settled this matter. Rather than keep it open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to close this file administratively without prejudice to reopening within 30 days of the date of this order. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file), they may do so within 30 days of this order. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/30/2016. (Shin, D.) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 03/29 4:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 3/29/2016. Case settled. Total Time: 6 hours (Sanders, C.) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/25 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stewart R. Gilson on behalf of NESC Staffing, Corp. (Gilson, Stewart) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of Good Standing
Fri 03/25 1:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re33 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stewart R. Gilson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3943336) by NESC Staffing, Corp.. (Gilson, Stewart) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/25 10:40 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stewart R. Gilson. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/24/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/25/2016. (Fazekas, J.) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/24 3:07 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Stewart R. Gilson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3943336) by NESC Staffing, Corp..(Maynard, Douglass) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Stewart R. Gilson's Admission as a Visiting Attorney | ||
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
utility
Calendar Entry
Wed 01/06 5:33 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Defendant Siemens Industry's Attorney request a continuance of the settlement conference scheduled January 5, 2016; granted. So Ordered by Judge William I. Garfinkel. Settlement Conference is rescheduled to 3/29/2016 @ 10:30 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. THE PREVIOUS ISSUED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT. (Sanders, C.) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 12/07 6:07 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amanda Maria DeMatteis terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/7/2015. (Shin, D.) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 12/07 12:17 PM
MOTION for Amanda M. DeMatteis to Withdraw as Attorney by Michele Masini. (DeMatteis, Amanda) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/03 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Paradisi on behalf of Michele Masini (Paradisi, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Settlement Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/13 2:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 10/13/2015, ( Settlement Conference set for 1/5/2016 @ 10:30 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IS ATTACHED FOR REVIEW). 30 minutes (Sanders, C.) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/13 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Maria DeMatteis on behalf of Michele Masini (DeMatteis, Amanda) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
utility
Calendar Entry
Thu 10/08 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for 10/13/2015 @ 2:30 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 190 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Sanders, C.) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order Scheduling Order
Wed 10/07 10:06 AM
ORDER APPROVING23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and ADOPTING the Case Management Plan proposed therein. SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/16/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2016; Joint Trial Memorandum due within 60 days of the Court's ruling on any dispositive motion, or, if no such motion is filed, within 90 days of the close of discovery; Trial Ready Date within 60 days after the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/7/2015. (Shin, D.) |
|
24 | 24
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/07 9:57 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Settlement Conference. (Shin, D.) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 10/06 11:52 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Testa, Paul) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 09/25 3:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Siemens Industry, Inc..(Testa, Paul) |
|
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/25 2:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by NESC Staffing, Corp..(Patterson, Brian) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Good Standing
Mon 08/31 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian G. Patterson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3715515) by NESC Staffing, Corp.. (Patterson, Brian) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/28 9:17 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian G. Patterson. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/27/2015.. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2015. (Fazekas, J.) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 08/28 9:13 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2015. (Fazekas, J.) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Fri 08/28 9:13 AM
Answer deadline updated for NESC Staffing, Corp. to 9/25/2015. (Fazekas, J.) |
||
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/27 3:59 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian G. Patterson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3715515) by NESC Staffing, Corp..(Maynard, Douglass) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/27 3:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until September 25, 2015 to respond to the Complaint by NESC Staffing, Corp.. (Maynard, Douglass) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/27 2:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NESC Staffing, Corp.. (Maynard, Douglass) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 08/24 11:32 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/24/2015. (Shin, D.) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Mon 08/24 11:33 AM
Answer deadline updated for Siemens Industry, Inc. to 9/27/2015. (Shin, D.) |
||
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Electronic Service Documents
Fri 08/21 11:12 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of5 Defendant's Statement re Removed Case filed by Siemens Industry, Inc.,2 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul A. Testa on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc.,7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Siemens Industry, Inc.,1 Notice of Removal filed by Siemens Industry, Inc.,3 Notice of Appearance filed by Patricia E. Reilly on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc.,9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,6 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by Siemens Industry, Inc.,12 Notice re Discovery Protocols,8 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2015 to File a Responsive Pleading1 Notice of Removal filed by Siemens Industry, Inc.,10 Standing Protective Order,4 Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal filed by Siemens Industry, Inc.,11 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2015.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Removal Standing Order | ||
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice
Fri 08/21 11:00 AM
NOTICE re Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2015.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Discovery Protocol Form | ||
11 | 11
order
Electronic Filing Order
Fri 08/21 10:55 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/20/2015.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
10 | 10
order
Protective Order
Fri 08/21 10:54 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/20/2015.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Fri 08/21 10:53 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 11/20/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2015.. Discovery due by 2/19/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2016. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2015.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/20 4:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2015 to File a Responsive Pleading1 Notice of Removal by Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Testa, Paul) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/20 2:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Siemens Industry, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Siemens, A.G., Other Affiliate Siemens Corporation for Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Testa, Paul) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/20 2:41 PM
NOTICE by Siemens Industry, Inc. of No Pending Motions (Testa, Paul) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/20 2:39 PM
NOTICE by Siemens Industry, Inc. of Defendant's Statement re Removed Case (Testa, Paul) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/20 2:36 PM
NOTICE by Siemens Industry, Inc. of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Testa, Paul) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/20 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia E. Reilly on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc. |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/20 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Testa on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc. (Testa, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 08/20 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Siemens Industry, Inc. from State of Connecticut Superior Court, case number HHD-CV-15-6061260-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0205-3707888, filed by Siemens Industry, Inc..(Testa, Paul) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 08/21 10:05 AM
Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Campbell, A) |