The State of New York Ex Rel Vinod Khurana et al v. Spherion Corp
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Referred: | Ona T Wang |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-06605 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332oc Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 16, 2016 7:12 AM EST |
Defendant
Spherion Corp (N/K/A SFN GROUP, INC.)
150 Presidential Way Suite 400
Woburn, MA 01801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Spherion Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
City Of New York
NYC Law Department 100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THE CITY OF NEW YORK EX REL VINROD KHURANA
285 Third Avenue, 16th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Plaintiff
The State of New York EX REL VINROD KHURANA
825 Third Avenue, 16th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Plaintiff
Vinod Khurana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The City of New York Ex Rel Vinod Khurana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The State of New York Ex Rel Vinod Khurana
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
267 | 267
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 05/14 1:53 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to263 Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Vinod Khurana USCA Case Number 21-220. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered"... Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 5/14/2021..(nd) |