Anonymous Doe et al v. Bryant et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Carlton W Reeves |
Referred: | Linda R Anderson |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00609 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 16, 2016 5:47 AM CST |
Defendant
Phil Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Hood
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Delbert Hosemann
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Robbin Stewart
P.O. Box 29164
Indianapolis, IN 46229 |
|
Plaintiff
Anonymous Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anonymous Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anonymous Roe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment
Mon 01/09 9:23 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing this action in its entirety against all defendants without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 1/9/17. (RRL) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 09/13 3:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Anonymous Company, Anonymous Doe, Anonymous Roe (Carner, Graham) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
order
Order Cancelling Deadline
Wed 04/13 3:49 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER cancelling 4/18/2016 Motion Hearing. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 4/13/2016. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE.(AC) |
||
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
order
Order Staying Case
Thu 03/31 5:07 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 3/31/2016.(AC) |
||
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 03/11 1:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by Phil Bryant, James Hood, Delbert Hosemann (Pizzetta, Harold) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 02/25 9:56 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response is due by 3/11/2016. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 2/25/2016. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (EJ) |
||
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 02/24 3:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Phil Bryant, James Hood, Delbert Hosemann (Pizzetta, Harold) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae
Mon 02/08 4:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Robbin Stewart.(RRL) |
|
Att: 1 Amicus Brief | ||
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/01 8:31 AM
Reset Hearing on2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, for 4/18/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson Federal Courthouse) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (AC) |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2015 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/10 9:51 AM
Reset Hearing as to2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing reset for 2/11/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson Federal Courthouse) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (AC) |
||
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/09 9:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Status Conference held in-chambers on 10/9/2015. Appearances: Graham P. Carner, Jonathan Eichelberger and Harold E. Pizzetta, Jr. Motion Hearing as to 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction reset for 12/15/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (JS) |
||
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
21
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 10/05 4:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction,3 Memorandum in Support of Motion,13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Anonymous Company, Anonymous Doe, Anonymous Roe (Carner, Graham) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/05 4:45 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: In-Chambers Status Conference set for 10/9/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. Motion Hearing will be rescheduled. (AC) |
||
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
order
Order
Wed 09/30 4:00 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiffs' ore tenus motion for additional time. Plaintiffs' response to Supplemental Memorandum due on or before 10/5/2015 at 5:00 PM and any Rebuttal is due by 10/7/2015. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL BE ISSUED. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/30/2015. (JS) |
||
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/18 3:30 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by Phil Bryant, James Hood, Delbert Hosemann(Pizzetta, Harold) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mayor Mary the Puppeteer, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Special Notices on Political Ads and Solicitations, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Pizzetta Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Carner Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Carner Email | ||
Tuesday, September 15, 2015 | ||
order
Order
Tue 09/15 4:09 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting State's ore tenus motion for additional time. State's supplemental response due on or before September 18, 2015. Plaintiffs' reply due on or before October 2, 2015. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 09/15/2015. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE.(AC) |
||
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/11 5:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Phil Bryant, James Hood, Delbert Hosemann.(Pizzetta, Harold) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/27 2:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/27/2015. Participants: Graham P. Carner, Jonathan M. Eichelberger and Harold Pizzetta. State of Mississippi shall file Supplemental Memorandum by 9/16/2015; Plaintiffs should file Response by 9/30/2015; and any Rebuttal is due by 10/7/2015. Motion Hearing set as to 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for 10/9/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (JS) |
||
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/24 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Matthew Eichelberger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Eichelberger, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
trial
Exhibit List
Fri 08/21 5:11 PM
Defendant(s) Exhibit List to 8/21/2015 hearing.(JS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit D-1 Mailed Flyer | ||
9 | 9
17
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 08/21 11:14 AM
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by James Hood(Pizzetta, Harold) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mailer, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - FEC Manual | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 08/21 8:32 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5: Disregard docket entry #5; this document has been re-filed as docket entry #8. (RRL) |
||
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 08/21 4:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves: Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2015 re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anonymous Company, Anonymous Roe and Anonymous Doe. Court heard arguments on the issues and reserved to rule after additional briefing. Telephone Status Conference set for 8/27/2015 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cherie Bond, Telephone Number : 601-608-4186. (JS) |
||
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/20 6:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anonymous Doe, Anonymous Roe, Anonymous Company (Carner, Graham) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/20 6:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anonymous Doe, Anonymous Roe, Anonymous Company Delbert Hosemann served on 8/20/2015, answer due 9/10/2015. (Carner, Graham) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/20 6:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anonymous Doe, Anonymous Roe, Anonymous Company James Hood served on 8/20/2015, answer due 9/10/2015. (Carner, Graham) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/20 6:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anonymous Doe, Anonymous Roe, Anonymous Company Phil Bryant served on 8/20/2015, answer due 9/10/2015. (Carner, Graham) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/20 2:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Phil Bryant, James Hood, Delbert Hosemann. (RRL) |
|
3 | 3
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 08/20 2:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anonymous Company, Anonymous Doe, Anonymous Roe. (RRL) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction
Thu 08/20 2:39 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the alternative, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Anonymous Company, Anonymous Doe, Anonymous Roe. (RRL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/20 2:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Phil Bryant, James Hood, Delbert Hosemann ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643034914), filed by Anonymous Doe, Anonymous Roe, Anonymous Company.(RRL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Mailer, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Press Release, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/20 4:24 PM
Set Hearing as to2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves. (JS) |