Demetriades v. Wytheville SSA, LLC et al
Virginia Western District Court | |
Judge: | Glen E Conrad |
Case #: | 7:15-cv-00454 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2015 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 11:59 PM EST |
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 05/09 5:41 PM
ORDER Dismissing the Case without prejudice; denying as moot13 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 5/9/2016. (bw) |
|
22 | 22
5
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Mon 05/09 5:39 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 5/9/2016. (bw) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response
Thu 12/17 4:35 PM
Response re20 Reply Brief in Support of14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Michele Demetriades, Peter Demetriades. (sas) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response
Wed 12/02 3:49 PM
Response re19 Response in Opposition to Motion, . filed by Dedorah Duncan, Jerome Malinary, Wytheville SSA, LLC.(Padmanabhan, Kartic) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Part 5 | ||
Wednesday, November 25, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response
Wed 11/25 3:24 PM
Response re16 Roseboro Notice. filed by Michele Demetriades, Peter Demetriades.(sas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 envelope | ||
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Roseboro Notice
Fri 11/06 11:17 AM
Roseboro Notice re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Michele Demetriades, Peter Demetriades. Deadline set for 11/30/2015. (eot) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Roseboro Notice
Fri 11/06 11:07 AM
Roseboro Notice re:14 Motion to Dismiss as to Dedorah Duncan, Jerome Malinary, Wytheville SSA, LLC. Deadline set for 11/30/2015. (eot) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Brief / Memorandum in Support
Thu 11/05 11:38 PM
Brief / Memorandum in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Dedorah Duncan, Jerome Malinary, Wytheville SSA, LLC.(Padmanabhan, Kartic) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-8, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits 9-16, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibits 17-24, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibits 25-32 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 11/05 11:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dedorah Duncan, Jerome Malinary, Wytheville SSA, LLC. (Padmanabhan, Kartic) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 10/26 2:40 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Michele Demetriades, Peter Demetriades.(eot) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 001 A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 001 B, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
service
Marshal's Return
Wed 10/07 3:09 PM
Marshal's Return of service unexecuted of Complaint and Summons upon Peter Demetriades and Michele Demetriades(eot) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties
Wed 09/23 11:26 AM
Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (eot) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 09/18 11:00 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Dedorah Duncan answer due 11/5/2015; Jerome Malinary answer due 11/5/2015; Wytheville SSA, LLC answer due 11/5/2015. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/17/2015. (lab) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 09/17 2:20 PM
OBJECTION to8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint, filed by Michele Demetriades, Peter Demetriades.(lab) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A 001 - 002, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B 001 - 004 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 09/17 11:37 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint, by Dedorah Duncan, Jerome Malinary, Wytheville SSA, LLC.(Padmanabhan, Kartic) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Marshal's Return
Fri 09/11 10:08 AM
Marshal's Return of service of Summons and Complaint on 8/28/15 upon Wytheville SSA, LLC(eot) |
|
6 | 6
service
Marshal's Return
Fri 09/11 10:06 AM
Marshal's Return of service of Summons & Complaint on 8/31/15 upon Dedorah Duncan(eot) |
|
5 | 5
service
Marshal's Return
Fri 09/11 10:04 AM
Marshal's Return of service of Summons and Complaint on 8/28/15 upon Jerome Malinary(eot) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/26 12:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Dedorah Duncan, Jerome Malinary, Wytheville SSA, LLC. and Wytheville SSA,LLC C/O Registered Agent.(eot) #1 USM Return Issued (Attached to Summons)) (eot) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/26 10:11 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/25/15. (eot) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/24 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Dedorah Duncan, Jerome Malinary, Wytheville SSA, LLC, filed by Peter Demetriades, Michele Demetriades. 100 Day Notice due by 12/2/2015 120 Day Service due by 12/22/2015(eot) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A001, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A002, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B001, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C001, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Copy of Letter | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/24 2:18 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michele Demetriades, Peter Demetriades. (eot) |