Brooke v. El Centro Hotel Partners, LLC
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger T Benitez |
Referred: | Ruben B Brooks |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-01874 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 20, 2016 7:58 AM PST |
Defendant
El Centro Hotel Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Brooke
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Positive Investments, Inc.
Terminated: 08/28/2015
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 01/11 3:14 PM
ORDER Granting11 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/11/2016. (knb) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Thu 01/07 2:23 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Theresa Brooke.(Strojnik, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Mon 11/16 2:56 PM
Minute Order. The early neutral evaluation conference set for December 22, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. A telephonic attorneys-only settlement disposition conference will be held on January 7, 2016, at 8:00 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Brooks unless a Joint Motion to Dismiss is e-filed prior. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 11/16/2015.(knb) |
|
Sunday, November 15, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Settlement
Sun 11/15 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Theresa Brooke (Strojnik, Peter) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 11/12 2:21 PM
ORDER granting7 Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/22/2015 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 11/12/2015. (kcm) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Continue
Tue 11/10 11:17 AM
MOTION to Continue Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Resolution Conference by Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Tue 11/03 1:43 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/8/2015 02:00 PM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 11/2/2015.(knb) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 10/13 2:42 PM
El Centro Hotel Partners, LLC ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint by El Centro Hotel Partners, LLC.(Heumann, Douglas)Attorney Douglas Charles Heumann added to party El Centro Hotel Partners, LLC(pty:dft) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/02 8:11 AM
Summons Issued re3 First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (knb) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/28 12:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Adding El Centro Hotel Partners LLC as Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Theresa Brooke.New Summons Requested. (Strojnik, Peter) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/24 12:25 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/24 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Positive Investments, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8354621.), filed by Theresa Brooke. The new case number is 3:15-cv-1874-BEN-RBB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Strojnik, Peter)(fth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |