WB Music Corp. et al v. Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick J Schiltz |
Referred: | Franklin L Noel |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-03360 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 21, 2016 9:11 AM CST |
Defendant
Estephan Hark
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Palabras De Romeo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Premium Latin Publishing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WB Music Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 01/11 9:29 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on January 11, 2016. (CLG) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/05 4:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp.. Jointly Signed by Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. and Estephan Hark.(Routhier, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 12/16 12:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY17 . It is therefore ORDERED that all pending deadlines are stayed until January 15, 2016, pending finalization of the settlement agreement. It is further ORDERED that, if the parties are not able to finalize the settlement agreement on or before January 15, 2016, then the stay will be automatically lifted on that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/15/15. (LEG) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stay
Mon 12/07 4:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Finalizaiton of Settlement by Estephan Hark, Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc.. (Seidl, Christopher) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order
Mon 12/07 11:37 AM
ORDER Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties (Dkt.14 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. and Estephan Hark shall have until December 7, 2015, to answer or otherwise defend in this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/4/15. (LEG) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
Thu 11/19 10:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Estephan Hark, Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. re14 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Seidl, Christopher) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Thu 11/19 10:49 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Estephan Hark, Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc.. Jointly Signed by WB Music Corp, Palabras De Romeo, and Premium Latin Publishing, Inc.. (Seidl, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Tue 11/03 12:34 PM
ORDER re12 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. and Estephan Hark shall have until November 23, 2015, to answer or otherwise defend in this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 11/2/15. (LEG) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Mon 11/02 9:39 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Estephan Hark, Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. (Seidl, Christopher) Jointly signed by Parties. Modified text on 11/2/2015 (las) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/09 10:34 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties (Dkt. 9), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. and Estephan Hark shall have until November 2, 2015, to answer or otherwise defend in this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 10/08/2015. (MMP) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
Mon 10/05 12:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Estephan Hark, Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. re9 Stipulation For Extension of Time (Seidl, Christopher) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Mon 10/05 12:12 PM
STIPULATION For Extension of Time by Estephan Hark, Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc.. (Seidl, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/05 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A Seidl on behalf of All Defendants. (Seidl, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 09/22 1:03 PM
Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. on September 11, 2015, filed by Palabras De Romeo, Premium Latin Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp.. (Routhier, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/26 4:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Estephan Hark and Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc. (MMP) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons
Wed 08/26 3:13 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Estephan Hark, Twin Cities Entertainment, Inc.. (Routhier, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 08/25 11:24 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 15-cv-3360 (PJS/FLN). (MMP) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/25 11:11 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Premium Latin Publishing. (Routhier, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/25 11:10 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.WB MUSIC CORP. is wholly owned by Warner Music Group Corp., which is publicly held. (Routhier, Peter) Modified on 8/25/2015 (MMP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/25 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4538003.) Filed by WB Music Corp., Premium Latin Publishing, Palabras De Romeo. No summons requested. (Routhier, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |