Old Cold, LLC
New Hampshire Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher J Panos |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-11400 |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 23, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Dec 30, 2015 |
Dismissed: | Oct 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Tempnology LLC, dba Coolcore
210 Commerce Way Ste 100
Portsmouth, NH 03801-8204 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Old Cold, LLC
210 Commerce Way Ste 100
Portsmouth, NH 03801-8204 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
1000 Elm Street Suite 605
Manchester, NH 03101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 11/21 4:24 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (twh) |