Scott v. WestRock Services, Inc.
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Travis R Mcdonough |
Referred: | Christopher H Steger |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00228 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 29, 2016 6:32 AM EST |
Defendant
WestRock Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rickey L. Scott
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Rock-Tenn Southern Container, LLC
Terminated: 10/16/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 08/11 3:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Case Joint by WestRock Services, Inc.. (Smith, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/10 4:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WestRock Services, Inc.. (Smith, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 05/04 6:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rickey L. Scott. (Belvin, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Deposition Order
Fri 04/29 2:54 PM
Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/29/16. (GRE, ) |
|
27 | 27
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/29 2:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/22/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/29/16. (GRE, ) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/29 2:52 PM
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a proper, comprehensive response to Defendant's motion on or before May 5, 2016. Defendant will be allowed 7 days from the date Plaintiff's response is filed to file a reply, if a reply is necessary. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/29/16. (GRE, ) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 05/02 12:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held on 4/29/2016. (DJH, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Wed 04/13 3:08 PM
TEXT ORDER Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/29/2016 at 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/13/2016. (TRT, ) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order
Wed 04/13 12:04 PM
TEXT ORDER Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/22/2016 at 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/13/2016. (TRT, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 01/27 1:27 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2016 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R McDonough.)Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/27/16. (KFB, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 12/17 2:33 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Curtis L Collier no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to District Judge Travis R McDonough for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/16/15. (KFB, ) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 12/16 9:22 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Rickey L. Scott. (Belvin, Robert) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 12/11 1:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/15/2016 .Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 12/11/15. (KFB, ) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 12/07 2:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WestRock Services, Inc.. (Smith, Mary) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 12/03 5:02 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rickey L. Scott. (Belvin, Robert) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 12/03 5:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Dismiss by Rickey L. Scott. (Belvin, Robert) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 11/19 1:09 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, Mary) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
9
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 11/05 3:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WestRock Services, Inc.. (Smith, Mary) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Thu 11/05 3:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by WestRock Services, Inc.. (Smith, Mary) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 10/23 3:53 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by WestRock Services, Inc..(Smith, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement | ||
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Consent/Nonconsent
Mon 10/19 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Rickey L. Scott (Belvin, Robert) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 10/16 10:31 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against WestRock Services, Inc.., filed by Rickey L. Scott.(Belvin, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Wed 10/14 6:41 PM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Upon plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint, defendant's assent to such motion, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that plaintiff may amend his complaint to substitute WestRock Services, Inc. as the proper defendant. This minute entry constitutes the complete order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10/8/2015. (Steger, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 10/08 3:05 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint filed by Rock-Tenn Southern Container, LLC. (Smith, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 10/06 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion5 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint : Motion Hearing IS RESET to 10/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KFB, ) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 10/06 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion5 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint : Motion Hearing is RESET to 10/15/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KFB, ) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Mon 10/05 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion5 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KFB, ) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 10/01 1:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint by Rickey L. Scott.(Belvin, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Other Proposed Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Other Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 03, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge
Thu 09/03 8:38 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/3/2015. (RLC, ) |
|
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent | ||
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Corporate Interest
Wed 09/02 5:51 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Rock-Tenn Southern Container, LLC identifying Corporate Parent WestRock Company for Rock-Tenn Southern Container, LLC. (Smith, Mary) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/02 5:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Rock-Tenn Southern Container, LLC.(Smith, Mary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 09/02 5:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton Chancery Court, case number 15-0420 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-2907152), filed by Rock-Tenn Southern Container, LLC.(Smith, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - All Record Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - SOS Rock-TN Services, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- SOS WestRock Services, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - SOS Rock-TN Southern Container, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - SOS WestRock Southern Container, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Rock-TN's Ntc of Removal (State), | ||
Att: 7 Other Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 09/03 8:26 AM
District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (RLC, ) |