Michael Everrett Harris v. Judge Peter J. Messitte
Original Case: 8:12-cv-03807
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv.us-02011 |
Type | civil u.s. / united states |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 09, 2016 8:00 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE PETER J. MESSITTE
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
ATTORNEY GENERAL LORETTA E. LYNCH
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL EVERRETT HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/09/2016 7:42 AM EST |
Thursday, September 03, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:12-cv-03807-RWT. Case manager: AshleyWebb. 15-2011 (ABW) | |
2 | 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 09/17/2015 15-2011 (ABW) | |
3 | 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Michael Everrett Harris 1439 Carol Drive Pomona, CA 91761-4573. Informal Opening Brief due 09/28/2015 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. 15-2011 (ABW) |