Petitjean et al v. Triton Asset Leasing GmbH et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carl Barbier |
Referred: | Donna Phillips Currault |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-04146 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 02, 2016 7:46 AM CST |
Defendant
Transocean Deepwater, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Transocean Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Triton Asset Leasing GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Michael J. Juneau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John M Petitjean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geralyn Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeb Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Reels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Taliancich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Yates
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/11 3:18 PM
ORDER - The five member cases referenced above are the class actions that served as procedural vehicles for the various class action settlements in this MDL. The Court has long since entered judgments granting final approval of these settlements and dismissing the class members' claims. . IT IS ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall mark the referenced member cases as CLOSED for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/11/21.(cg) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 06/05 8:22 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Wed 02/15 2:30 PM
FINAL ORDER & JUDGMENT granting approval of HESI and Transocean punitive damages and assigned claims settlement agreements as set forth in document. (filed in MDL 2179 as doc #22253). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/15/17.(sek) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 02/15 2:29 PM
ORDER & REASONS: Granting Final Approval of the HESI and Transocean Punitive Damages and Assigned Claims Class Action Settlements as set forth in document. (filed in MDL 2179 as doc #22252). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/15/17.(sek) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 08/03 11:47 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 10/08 5:28 PM
ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 5/20/2013.(gec) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 10/08 5:26 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12, #25, #31, & #41 2nd Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(gec) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/08 1:10 PM
Transocean's ANSWER to1 Complaint, [Transocean's Punitive Damages Class] by Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Holdings, LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Triton Asset Leasing GmbH.Attorney Kerry J. Miller added to party Transocean Deepwater, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kerry J. Miller added to party Transocean Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kerry J. Miller added to party Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kerry J. Miller added to party Triton Asset Leasing GmbH(pty:dft).(Miller, Kerry) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 09/11 11:09 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the pink/green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (gec) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 09/08 2:46 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (mmv) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/04 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT against John M Petitjean (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5010571) filed by John M Petitjean.Attorney Stephen J. Herman added to party John M Petitjean(pty:pla).(Herman, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |