Gbelia v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas L Rayes |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01799 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Title |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 07, 2016 7:08 AM MST |
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Adolphus Gbelia
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
David W Cowles
Terminated: 09/29/2015
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 18 2016
ORDER - Defendant Nationstar's 11 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 03/18/2016. (ATD) |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 03/18 4:54 PM
ORDER - Defendant Nationstar's11 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 03/18/2016. (ATD) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 01/11 2:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Special Action Complaint; Application for Order to Show Cause Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Special Action Complaint; Application for Order to Show Cause filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Nelson, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 12/23 10:33 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Special Action Complaint; Application for Order to Show Cause filed by Peter Adolphus Gbelia. (Warnicke, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 12/08 3:35 PM
ORDER pursuant to12 Stipulation for Extension of Time Regarding Nationstars Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiff Peter Adolphus Gbelia shall have through and including 12/18/2015 within which to respond to Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Doc.11 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC will have through and including 1/11/2016 to submit its reply in suffice of its Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/8/2015. (MMO) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Fri 12/04 2:01 PM
STIPULATION Stipulation for Extension of Time Regarding Nationstar's Motion to Dismiss (First Request) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Nelson, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 11/16 6:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Special Action Complaint; Application for Order to Show Cause by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Nelson, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-2, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3-3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3-4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3-5 | ||
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 10/14 4:37 PM
ORDER pursuant to the parties'9 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Special Action Complaint (Second Request): The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Special Action Complaint is extended through and including 11/16/2015, or within ten days written notice of either party. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/14/2015. (MMO) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Wed 10/14 2:52 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Second Request Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Special Action Complaint .(Nelson, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/29 5:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peter Adolphus Gbelia. (Warnicke, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 09/22 3:07 PM
ORDER pursuant to the parties'4 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Special Action Complaint (First Request): The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Special Action Complaint is extended through and including 10/16/2015 or within ten days' written notice of either party. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/22/2015. (MMO) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/22 9:30 AM
ORDER that, within seven (7) days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either (1) show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss Defendant David W. Cowles pursuant to A.R.S. § 33-807(E) and accept jurisdiction over this matter or (2) stipulate to the dismissal of David W. Cowles. Nothing in this order limits Plaintiff's right to separately object to the removal in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/21/2015. (MMO) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Wed 09/16 5:54 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/16/2015. (MMO) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Mon 09/14 4:33 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Request) Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Special Action Complaint .(Nelson, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 09/09 3:57 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12093861. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 15-01799 PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (LAD) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/09 3:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Incorporated for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (submitted by Kevin Nelson) (LAD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 09/09 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2015-009867. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12093861 filed by David W Cowles, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (submitted by Kevin Nelson)(LAD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |