Wells-Krob v. Atlantic Credit and Finance Incorporated
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01812 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 08, 2016 6:53 AM MST |
Defendant
Atlantic Credit and Finance Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Wells-Krob
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 03/08 2:18 PM
ORDER Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties. Doc.19 . IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation (Doc. 19) is granted. This case is dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/8/2016. (KMG) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 03/07 1:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Patricia Wells-Krob.(Kent, Trinette) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Fri 01/22 9:17 AM
ORDER re:17 Notice of Settlement - that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 60 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. FURTHER ORDERED vacating any pending hearings; denying all pending motions as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on March 22, 2016 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/22/2016. (KMG) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 01/22 7:34 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Patricia Wells-Krob. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Wed 01/13 9:02 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Patricia Wells-Krob. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 01/13 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Patricia Wells-Krob. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 11/30 10:42 AM
ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/30/2015. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Tue 11/24 11:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 15-1812 PHX-DGC. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for December 7, 2015 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))
Wed 11/18 12:32 PM
Ordered that Atlantic Credit and Finance Incorporated show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge Susan R Bolton. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/7/2015 at 04:30 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/30 3:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Atlantic Credit and Finance Incorporated.(Fife, William) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 10/22 2:50 PM
ORDER granting9 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Atlantic Credit and Finance Incorporated answer due 10/30/2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Parties' Joint Stipulation (Doc.8 )as it is a duplicative filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 10/22/15. (LAD) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Fri 10/16 4:28 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT .(Fife, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Time for Answer | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Fri 10/16 3:36 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT . (Fife, William) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Service Executed
Thu 10/08 6:55 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Wells-Krob: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice upon Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc. on 9/25/2015. (Kent, Trinette) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Mon 09/14 2:01 PM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KMG) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/11 11:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Atlantic Credit and Finance Incorporated. (KGM) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/11 11:25 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Patricia Wells-Krob (submitted by Trinette Kent). (KGM) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 09/11 11:23 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12101418. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 15-1812 PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 MAG 25 Instructions | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 09/11 11:21 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Patricia Wells-Krob (submitted by Trinette Kent). (KGM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/11 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12101418 filed by Patricia Wells-Krob (submitted by Trinette Kent).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |