Jan M. Sensenich et al v. Unifund CCR, LLC
Vermont Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Colleen A Brown |
Case #: | 5:15-ap-01031 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Unifund CCR, LLC
10625 Techwoods Circle
Cincinnati, OH 45242 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jan M. Sensenich, Chapter 13 Trustee of the Estate of Andrew Pettit
P.O. Box 1326
Norwich, VT 05055 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Clayton Pettit
P.O. Box 4356
White River Junction, VT 05001 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 03/10 2:08 PM
Adversary Proceeding 5:15-ap-1031 Closed. Disposition - Dismissal Prior to an Answer being Filed. (Kennedy, Jody USBC-VT) |
||
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Dismissal in an AP (Stipulated or Prior to Answer)
Tue 03/01 11:08 AM
Notice of Dismissal Prior to an Answer being Filed in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Rebecca A Rice on behalf of Andrew Clayton Pettit, Jan M. Sensenich. (Rice, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Tue 10/13 4:30 PM
Copy of Letter to Trustee Jan M. Sensenich w/attachment Filed by John C. Gravel on behalf of Unifund CCR, LLC Re:1 Complaint. (Wennberg, Nancy USBC-VT) |
|
Sunday, September 13, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC - Summons Issued
Mon 09/14 1:12 AM
Certificate of Notice by Bankruptcy Noticing Center Re:2 Summons with Order on Pre-Trial Deadlines and Scheduling Order Form 7026(f). Notice Date 09/13/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/11 3:37 PM
Certificate of Service of Process Filed by Rebecca A Rice on behalf of Andrew Clayton Pettit Re:1 Complaint,2 Summons with Order on Pre-Trial Deadlines and Scheduling Order Form 7026(f). (Rice, Rebecca) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/11 2:19 PM
Summons with Order on Pre-Trial Deadlines and Scheduling Order Form 7026(f) Issued on Unifund CCR, LLC Answer Due 10/12/2015. (Kennedy, Jody USBC-VT) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 09/11 2:01 PM
Adversary case 15-01031 Complaint by Jan M. Sensenich, Andrew Clayton Pettit against Unifund CCR, LLC. Payment Not Due at this Time, Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: 12 (Rice, Rebecca) |