Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Quality Solutions, LLC
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Harold L Murphy |
Referred: | Walter E Johnson |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-00176 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 13, 2016 8:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
QSI Business Solutions, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Quality Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ashley Gazaway
|
|
Interested Party
Gary Gazaway
|
|
Interested Party
Kayla Medeiros
|
|
Plaintiff
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Thu 02/18 4:30 PM
CONSENT DECREE settling case. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 2/18/16. (jta) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Consent Order
Thu 02/18 9:11 AM
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Consent Decree Settling the Case. (Wagner, Steven) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 02/18 4:32 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson terminated from case. (jta) |
||
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 02/01 11:26 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Gordon M. Berger and Loren J. Beer, and the law firm of FORDHARRISONLLP are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant. Attorneys William E. Grob and Natalie N. Turner, and the law firm of Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C., will continue as lead counsel for Defendant.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 2/1/16. (klb) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Withdraw As Attorney
Mon 02/01 10:10 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Gordon Myles Berger as Attorneyby Quality Solutions, LLC.(Berger, Gordon) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/27 5:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Grob on behalf of Quality Solutions, LLC (Grob, William) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Leave of Absence
Tue 12/29 3:45 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 1/15/16, 1/16/16, 1/17/16, 1/18/16, 1/19/16, 1/20/16, 1/21/16, 1/22/16, by Steven A. Wagner. (Wagner, Steven) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 12/17 11:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 4/14/2016. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 1/15/2016. Motions for summary judgment no later than 5/16/16. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/16/2016 or within 30 days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/17/15. (klb) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 12/17 10:33 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Quality Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/17/2015 (klb) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Thu 12/17 10:31 AM
ORDER granting7 Consent Motion to Amend Complaint. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter the Amended Complaint attached to the Motion as Exhibit A on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/15/15. (klb) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Initial Disclosures
Wed 12/16 6:19 PM
Initial Disclosures by QSI Business Solutions, LLC.(Berger, Gordon) |
|
8 | 8
discov
Initial Disclosures
Wed 12/16 2:45 PM
Initial Disclosures by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Wagner, Steven) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Amend
Mon 12/14 3:32 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Wagner, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
misc
Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
Mon 12/14 1:43 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Wagner, Steven) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Mon 11/16 12:37 PM
Clerks Notation re4 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 11/16/15. (jta) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 11/16 10:20 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by QSI Business Solutions, LLC. (Beer, Loren) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/16 10:16 AM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by QSI Business Solutions, LLC. Discovery ends on 4/14/2016.(Berger, Gordon) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 10/14 8:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. QSI Business Solutions, LLC waiver mailed on 9/16/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (Wagner, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/15 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(jta) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |