Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. North Memorial Health Care
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | David S Doty |
Referred: | Katherine M Menendez |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-03675 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 14, 2016 6:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
North Memorial Health Care
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 06 2017
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/6/2017. (DLO) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 12/11 3:22 PM
MANDATE of USCA (electronic copy) as to34 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (AKL) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Judgment
Tue 11/13 12:07 PM
USCA JUDGMENT (electronic copy) as to34 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (AKL) |
|
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Opinion
Tue 11/13 12:06 PM
Opinion of USCA (electronic copy) as to34 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (AKL) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Transmittal of Appeal Letter (NEF sent to USCA)
Fri 09/22 12:23 PM
TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U.S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re:39 TRANSCRIPT sent conventionally/under separate cover. (lmb) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Transcript Request
Thu 09/21 3:37 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by North Memorial Health Care for a COPY OF 39 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (Hatcher, Krista) |
|
39 | 39
misc
Transcript
Thu 09/21 1:47 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 5/11/2017 before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (36 pages). Court Reporter: Renee Rogge. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents . For information on redaction procedures, please review [LINK:Local Rule 5.5] . Redaction Request due 10/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2017. (RAR) |
|
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Thu 09/21 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (RAR) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Transcript Request
Wed 09/13 2:49 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of 31 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (Burnside, Tina) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 09/06 9:50 AM
USCA Case Number 17-2926 for34 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (AKL) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
Transmittal of Appeal Letter (NEF sent to USCA)
Fri 09/01 12:49 PM
TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U.S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit34 . (lmb) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit
Wed 08/30 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to33 Judgment by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Burnside, Tina) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Thu 07/06 4:33 PM
JUDGMENT. (lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 07/06 3:32 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/6/2017. (DLO) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 05/11 10:37 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Appearances: Tina Burnside & Jean Kamp for plaintiff; Karen Schanfield & Krista Hatcher for defendant; Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2017 re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Memorial Health Care - argued and taken under advisement. Order to be issued. TIME IN COURT: 45 minutes. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (CLB) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Wed 04/19 3:49 PM
Second AFFIDAVIT of Krista A.P. Hatcher in SUPPORT OF19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Memorial Health Care.(Schanfield, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-F | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply
Wed 04/19 3:47 PM
REPLY re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Memorial Health Care.(Schanfield, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/04 12:08 PM
DECLARATION of Tina Burnside in Opposition to19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Burnside, Tina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1. Interview Questions, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2. 11/11/13 Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3. 1/2/14 Email, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4. Minshull Notes, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5. 11/20/13 Letter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6. 11/20/13 Email, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 7. 11/21/13 Email, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 8. Def. Position Statement, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 9. 11/20/13 Email, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) 10. Def. Answers to 1st Set of Interrog., | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) 11. 11/21/13 Email, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) 12. 12/10/13 Email, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) 13. Job Posting, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) 14. 11/23/14 Letter, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) 15. Warnert Application, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) 16. Sure-Ondara Application, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) 17. 1/7/14 Email, | ||
Att: 18 Sure-Ondara Deposition, | ||
Att: 19 Wombacher Deposition, | ||
Att: 20 Levens Deposition, | ||
Att: 21 Clements Deposition, | ||
Att: 22 Minshull Deposition, | ||
Att: 23 Smith Deposition, | ||
Att: 24 Conklin Deposition | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/04 11:35 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Burnside, Tina) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/28 9:46 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NOTICE re: Hearing on defendant's motion for summary judgment set for 5/3/2017 at 9:30 a.m. is rescheduled due to the Court's schedule to 5/11/2017 at 9:30 a.m. The hearing will be held before Judge David S. Doty, Courtroom 14W, 300 South 4th Street, Minneapolis, MN. Each side will have 15 minutes for oral argument. (CLB) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Wed 03/15 2:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Krista A.P. Hatcher in SUPPORT OF19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Memorial Health Care.(Hatcher, Krista) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-S | ||
24 | 24
service
Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
Wed 03/15 12:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by North Memorial Health Care re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hatcher, Krista) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Wed 03/15 11:48 AM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DOCUMENT TEMPORARILY SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Krista A.P. Hatcher in SUPPORT OF19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Memorial Health Care.(Hatcher, Krista) Access Temporarily Restricted. Modified on 3/15/2017 (las) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 03/15 11:47 AM
Declaration of Nicholas J. Wombacher in Support of19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Memorial Health Care. (Attachment: Exhibit A). (Hatcher, Krista) Modified text on 3/15/2017 (lmb) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 03/15 11:44 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Memorial Health Care.(Hatcher, Krista) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 02/28 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION19 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Hatcher, Krista) Modified on 2/28/2017 (lmb) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 02/28 9:48 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Memorial Health Care. (Hatcher, Krista) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice to Attorney - JSM Case Reassigned
Fri 11/18 2:53 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 15-cv-3675 DSD/KMM . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/20 2:25 PM
AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: re: Stipulation16 . Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 7/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 10/20/2016. (las) |
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Tue 10/18 10:27 AM
STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Burnside, Tina) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Fri 10/14 7:36 AM
ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 10/14/2016. (CLB) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Thu 10/13 3:27 PM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. STIPULATION to Modify Scheduling Order by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Burnside, Tina) Modified text on 10/13/2016 (lmb) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution
Wed 06/15 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Burnside, Tina) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 04/15 3:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Settlement Conference held on 4/14/2016. No settlement reached. (las) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Fri 02/26 4:17 PM
ORDER for Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 2/26/16. (kt) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/12 2:48 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/30/2016. Motions (non-disp) due 10/14/2016. Motions (disp) due by 4/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 7/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 1/12/2016. (las) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 01/05 3:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Pretrial Conference held on 1/5/2016. Pretrial scheduling conference held. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (kt) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 12/22 11:09 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Jointly Signed by North Memorial Health Care.(Palmer-Denig, Jessica) |
|
Wednesday, November 25, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Wed 11/25 12:52 PM
ORDER In Re: Dispositive-Motion Practice. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/25/2015. (CLB) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 11/19 3:31 PM
ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2016 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 11/19/2015.. (ALM) Modified text on 11/19/2015 (lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 11/17 4:00 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susan Richard Nelson recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 15-cv-3675 (DSD/JSM) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/17/2015. (ALM) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/16 11:01 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by North Memorial Health Care. (Hatcher, Krista) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 09/24 9:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. North Memorial Health Care waiver sent on 9/16/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (Palmer-Denig, Jessica) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 09/16 1:09 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil Rights - Individual Employment List and referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Please use case number 15-cv-3675 (SRN/JSM). (lmb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/16 12:12 PM
COMPLAINT against North Memorial Health Care. Filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. No summons requested. (Palmer-Denig, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |