Kenneth Fairley, Sr., et al v. Hattiesburg Mississippi, et al
Original Case: 2:13-cv-00018
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cr-60637 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 30, 2016 2:07 PM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
HATTIESBURG MISSISSIPPI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HATTIESBURG MISSISSIPPI DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
HATTIESBURG MISSISSIPPI REPUBLICAN EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HATTIESBURG MISSISSIPPI ELECTION COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
REVEREND KENNETH E. FAIRLEY, SR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
REVEREND D. FRANKLIN BROWNE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DENNIS D. HENDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CARLOS WILSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
FRED BURNS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARLES BARTLEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CLARENCE MAGEE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 28 2016
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-60637 Affirmed ] Judge: CES , Judge: EBC , Judge: CH. Mandate pull date is 12/19/2016 [15-60637] |
1. | Federal court rules Hattiesburg ward plan not discriminatory (wdam.com) |
Submitted Wed 11/30/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 11/30/2016 2:07 PM CST |
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Charles Bartley, Mr. D. Franklin Browne, Mr. Fred Burns, Mr. Kenneth E. Fairley, Sr., Mr. Dennis D. Henderson, Mr. Clarence Magee and Mr. Carlos Wilson 15-60637 (MAS) |