Bivins v. Rogers et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth A Marra |
Referred: | William Matthewman |
Case #: | 9:15-cv-81298 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Case in other court: | 17-14978-K |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 15, 2016 9:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Beys Liston Mobargha & Berland, LLP
825 Third Avenue, 2nd Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ciklin Lubitz Martens & O'Connell
515 N. Flagler Drive, 20th Floor
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ashley N. Crispin
515 N. Flagler Drive, 20th Floor
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephen M Kelly
as successor guardian 639 E. Ocean Avenue, Suite 208
Boynton Beach, FL 33435 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Law Offices of Keith B. Stein
800 West End Avenue, #3A
New York, NY 10025 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian M. O'Connell
515 N. Flagler Drive, 20th Floor
West Palm Beach, FL 33401 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Curtis Cahalloner Rogers, Jr.
as former guardian 710 1st Avenue South
Lake Worth, FL 33460 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keith B. Stein
800 West End Avenue, #3A
New York, NY 10025 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julian Bivins
as personal Representative of the ancillary Estate of Oliver Bivins 13554 E. Columbine
Scottsdale, AZ 85259 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
434 | 434
14
pgs
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 01/18 12:20 PM
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy). AFFIRM Judgment of the district court with court's opinion re430 Notice of Appeal, filed by Julian Bivins; Date Issued: 1/18/2019; USCA Case Number: 17-14978 JJ. (apz) |