Toney, III v. Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Gardephe |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-07413 |
Nature of Suit | 368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446as Notice of Removal - Asbestos Litigation |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 16, 2016 9:59 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
Warren Pumps, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
IMO Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Tyco International (US) Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
The Nash Engineering Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
The J.R. Clarkson Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Taco, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Ingersoll-Rand Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Goulds Pumps Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Foster Wheeler LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
FMC Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Crane Co.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CBS Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CBS Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The J.R. Clarkson Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Crane Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warren Pumps, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco International (US) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Nash Engineering Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The J.R. Clarkson Company
|
|
Defendant
Taco, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FMC Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ingersoll-Rand Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
IMO Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goulds Pumps Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Foster Wheeler LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FREDERICK LEE TONEY, III
|
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Lee Tonery, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
156 | 156
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 09/25 3:32 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated September 22, 2017, Crane's motion for summary judgment is granted. Because all of Toney's claims against Crane's co-defendants have been dismissed, the Court denies as moot Defendant Taco, Inc.'s unopposed motion for summary judgment as to all cross- claims. All claims and cross-claims having been dismissed, Toney's motion for consolidation with Snyder v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp. et al., 15 Civ. 8738 (LAK) is denied as moot; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/25/2017)(km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Right to Appeal | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
155 | 155
20
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion for Oral Argument
Fri 09/22 12:24 PM
ORDER denying as moot112 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot116 Motion to Consolidate Cases ; terminating121 Letter Motion for Oral Argument; granting125 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating135 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. For the reasons stated above, Crane's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 125) is granted. Because all of Taney's claims against Crane's co-defendants have been dismissed (see Dkt. Nos. 85-86, 100, 110, 139, 144-48, 151-52, 154), the Court denies as moot Defendant Taco, Inc. 's unopposed motion for summary judgment as to all cross-claims. (Dkt. No. 112) All claims and cross-claims having been dismissed, Taney's motion for consolidation with Snyder v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp. et al., 15 Civ. 8738 (LAK) is denied as moot. (Dkt. No. 116) The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 112, 116, 121, 125, 135) and to close this case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/22/2017) (cf) |
|
misc
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk
Fri 09/22 12:24 PM
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re:155 Order to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (cf) |