ChanBond, LLC v. Cequel Communications, LLC et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Andrews |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00846 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 19, 2016 10:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cequel Communications, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ChanBond, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
109 | 109
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Mon 07/12 2:49 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,941,822; 8,341,679; 8,984,565.(nms) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
utility
Terminate Case - Civil
Mon 07/12 12:27 PM
CASE CLOSED per entry of D.I. 592 in Lead Civil Action 15-842-RGA. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00843-RGA et al.(nms) |