Dos Santos v. Telexelectric LLLP et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Neil V Wake |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01906 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 21, 2016 7:35 AM MST |
Defendant
TD Bank NA
|
|
Defendant
OPT3 Solutions Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Price Waterhouse Coopers LLP
|
|
Defendant
Propay Incorportated
|
|
Defendant
RSB Citizens NA
|
|
Defendant
Richard W Waak Attorney at Law PLLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanderley Rodrigues De Vasconcelos
|
|
Defendant
Daniil Shoyfer
|
|
Defendant
Faith R Sloan
|
|
Defendant
Dustin Sparman
|
|
Defendant
Synovus Bank
|
|
Defendant
Gerald P Nehra
|
|
Defendant
Telex Mobile Holdings Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Telexelectric LLLP
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Defendant
Vantage Payments LLC
|
|
Defendant
Richard W Waak
|
|
Defendant
Carlos N Wanzeler
|
|
Defendant
Katia Wanzeler
|
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank NA
|
|
Defendant
Allied Wallet Limited
|
|
Defendant
Fidelity Cooperative Bank
|
|
Defendant
Allied Wallet LTD
|
|
Defendant
Bank of America NA
|
|
Defendant
Base Commerce LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason A Borromei
|
|
Defendant
Carlos Costa
|
|
Defendant
Joseph H Craft
|
|
Defendant
Craft Financial Solutions LLC
|
|
Defendant
Randy N Crosby
|
|
Defendant
Santiago De La Rosa
|
|
Defendant
Ann Genet
|
|
Defendant
Gerald P Nehra Attorney at Law PLLC
|
|
Defendant
Global Payroll Gateway Incorportated
|
|
Defendant
John Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
International Payout Systems Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Steven M Labriola
|
|
Defendant
James M Merrill
|
|
Defendant
John F Merrill
|
|
Defendant
Scott Miller
|
|
Plaintiff
Rita Dos Santos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago |
Friday, April 01, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Fri 04/01 12:30 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:16 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Rita Dos Santos. Document entered in wrong case. This action was transferred to the District of Massachusetts on 10/20/2015. It's New Case Number at the District of Massachusetts is: 1:15-cv-13614. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. No further filings should be made in this closed case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ATD) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/31 10:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Rita Dos Santos. (German, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Submitted
Tue 10/27 9:58 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Rita Dos Santos. (German, Steven) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Submitted
Tue 10/27 9:57 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Rita Dos Santos. (German, Steven) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service Executed
Tue 10/27 9:22 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rita Dos Santos: Certificate of Service re: Summons in Civil Action 2:15-CV-01906-NVW upon Vantage Payments, LLC on 10/07/2015. (German, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Wed 10/21 3:09 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Electronic Transfer Case in the District of Massachusetts. New Case Number: 1:15-cv-13614. (MAP) |
||
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel
Tue 10/20 2:25 PM
CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) Transferring Case to the District of Massachusetts Re MDL-2566. (MAP) |
|
misc
Remark (Public)
Tue 10/20 2:26 PM
Remark: Case Transferred to the District of Massachusetts via electronic transfer. (MAP) |
||
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/19 2:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Stay and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike or in the Alternative Stay filed by Rita Dos Santos.(German, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 | ||
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 10/05 4:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Base Commerce LLC. (Marconi, Andrea) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 10/05 3:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Base Commerce LLC, John Hughes.(Marconi, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4 | ||
Monday, September 28, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 09/28 7:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Dustin Sparman, Vantage Payments LLC.(BAS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 09/25 3:52 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Rita Dos Santos. (German, Steven) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 09/25 3:50 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Rita Dos Santos. (German, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Supplement
Wed 09/23 2:22 PM
SUPPLEMENT Automated Civil Cover Sheet re:1 Complaint by Plaintiff Rita Dos Santos. (German, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Wed 09/23 1:49 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/23/15. (NKS) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Wed 09/23 12:26 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AUTOMATED CIVIL COVER SHEET. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Wed 09/23 12:25 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12142212. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 15-1906 PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KGM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/23 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12142212 filed by Rita Dos Santos (submitted by Steven German).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |