KABANA v. C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Stanley R Chesler |
Referred: | Cathy L Waldor |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-07177 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Fraud |
Case Filed: | Sep 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 27, 2016 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL W. KABANA
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 22 2015
OPINION & ORDER - Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Remand is GRANTED; This case is Remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 12/22/2015. (anr) |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter: Remand
Tue 12/22 4:19 PM
Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Union County Courthouse 2 Broad Street Elizabeth, NJ 07207 State No: L-02946-15. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (anr) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Tue 12/22 4:17 PM
OPINION & ORDER - Plaintiff's4 Motion to Remand is GRANTED; This case is Remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 12/22/2015. (anr) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 12/22 4:20 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (anr) |
||
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/08 4:32 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC. re7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (DABBY, KIRA) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/01 10:14 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by DANIEL W. KABANA re7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (ADLER, LEWIS) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Lewis Adler with exhibit | ||
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Mon 11/23 1:27 PM
CONSENT ORDER - Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on or before 12/1/2015 and Defendant's Reply Brief shall be filed on or before 12/8/2015. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/23/2015. (anr) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Fri 11/20 9:59 AM
Letter from All Parties Reqeusting Adjournment of Due Dates.(CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Thu 11/12 2:39 PM
TEXT ORDER The Court will reschedule the 2/10/16 conference to 1/22/16 at 10:00 am. The conference will be held before the undersigned in courtroom 4c of the MLK Courthouse, 50 Walnut St. Newark NJ. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/12/15. (tjg, ) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Thu 11/05 3:28 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DANIEL W. KABANA re4 MOTION to Remand (ADLER, LEWIS) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
Mon 11/02 6:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC. re4 MOTION to Remand (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/23 9:11 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 12/7/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (tt, ) |
||
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/21 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. KELLEHER on behalf of C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC. (KELLEHER, EDWARD) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint)
Wed 10/21 10:43 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC.. Amendment to7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Correcting the Signature Line of the Brief Per the Clerk's Quality Control Message . (DABBY, KIRA) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 10/21 9:40 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 2/10/16 at 1:15 pm. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/21/15. (tjg, ) |
|
qc
QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney
Wed 10/21 9:46 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The BRIEF attached to the Motion to Dismiss7 submitted by K. DABBY on 10/20/2015 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (anr) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/21 12:00 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 11/16/2015 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (anr) |
||
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Letter Rule 7.1
Tue 10/20 4:35 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by DANIEL W. KABANA re7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (ADLER, LEWIS) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Tue 10/20 3:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC.. Responses due by 11/2/2015(DABBY, KIRA) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Letter Rule 7.1
Thu 10/15 12:40 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re4 MOTION to Remand . (CHEWNING, KERRI) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certification
Wed 10/07 7:01 PM
Certification of of Servioce on behalf of DANIEL W. KABANA Re4 Remand to State Court. (ADLER, LEWIS) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Remand to State Court
Wed 10/07 3:50 PM
MOTION to Remand by DANIEL W. KABANA.(ADLER, LEWIS) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Lewis Adler, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/07 4:09 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 11/2/2015 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (anr) |
||
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Wed 09/30 10:25 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC. (dam) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/30 10:23 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC. (dam) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 09/30 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF UNION COUNTY, case number L-2946-15. (Filing and Admin fee $400 receipt number 0312-6668988), filed by C.A.R.S. PROTECTION PLUS, INC..(dam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service |