Chapman v. Houret Strip Mall et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Howard R Lloyd |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-04507 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 28, 2016 1:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Houret Family Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Houret Strip Mall
|
|
Plaintiff
Byron Chapman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 07/22 4:41 PM
Stipulation 15 and Order of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 07/13 11:01 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Byron Chapman. (Frankovich, Thomas) (Filed on 7/13/2016) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
adr
Certification of Mediation Session
Tue 06/14 8:25 AM
CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session by phone multiple calls 5/23/2016 to 6/10/2016 conducted by Mediator, Howard Herman. Case settled, mediation complete. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
Wed 05/11 9:43 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Howard A. Herman as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
adr
Notice of Need for Mediation - ADA Cases Only
Wed 03/09 3:41 PM
Notice of Need for Mediation by Thomas E. Frankovich (Frankovich, Thomas) (Filed on 3/9/2016) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 12/01 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Byron Chapman. Houret Family Limited Partnership served on 11/1/2015, answer due 11/23/2015. (Frankovich, Thomas) (Filed on 12/1/2015) |
|
Wednesday, November 25, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 11/25 10:36 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Houret Family Limited Partnership.. (Olson, Christopher) (Filed on 11/25/2015) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 11/25 10:36 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Houret Family Limited Partnership (Olson, Christopher) (Filed on 11/25/2015) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/25 10:35 AM
ANSWER to Complaint byHouret Family Limited Partnership. (Olson, Christopher) (Filed on 11/25/2015) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 10/20 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas E. Frankovich (Frankovich, Thomas) (Filed on 10/20/2015) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 10/15 5:56 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Byron Chapman.. (Frankovich, Thomas) (Filed on 10/15/2015) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/06 8:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Houret Family Limited Partnership. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 10/05 11:50 AM
Proposed Summons. (Frankovich, Thomas) (Filed on 10/5/2015) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Fri 10/02 1:23 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 10/01 10:13 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/30 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Houret Family Limited Partnership ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9879954.). Filed byByron Chapman.(Frankovich, Thomas) (Filed on 9/30/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |