TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY v. LEWIS et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Randolph D Moss |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01643 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 04, 2016 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
SARAH JENKINS
Individually and as Legal Representative of the Estate of S.J. 1407 Southern Avenue Apartment 302
Oxon Hill, MD 20745 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEROME LEWIS
|
|
Plaintiff
TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/26 2:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lankford, Lindsay) |
|
order
.Order
Fri 08/26 2:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Stipulation of Dismissal19 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/26/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
||
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 08/11 5:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The clerk is hereby directed to mail Jerome Lewis a printout of the docket and copies of the Court's orders in this case. The parties are hereby ORDERED to mail a copy of their respective pleadings to Lewis, as well as copies of all of their respective filings going forward. These documents are to be sent to the address listed in Lewis's letter to the court18 . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/11/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
||
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Thu 08/11 1:26 PM
Letter to the Court from JEROME LEWIS "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED", by Judge Randolph D. Moss (zrdj) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/06 11:47 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Expert disclosures shall be made on or before July 6, 2016. (2) Any motions to amend the pleadings and/or join additional parties shall be filed on or before July 13, 2016. (3) Discovery will close on August 5, 2016. (4) Any dispositive motions shall be filed on or before September 5, 2016. (5) Any opposition shall be due within fourteen days of a dispositive motion, or fourteen days following the close of discovery, whichever is later. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/6/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 06/06 10:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 6/6/2016. The Court will extend the deadlines previously set. Amended Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) Modified on 6/6/2016 to add the word "Amended"(kt) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 06/06 3:06 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert disclosures shall be made on or before 7/6/2016; Any motions to amend the pleadings and/or join additional parties shall be filed on or before 7/13/2016; Discovery will close on 8/5/2016; Any dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 9/5/2016. (kt) |
||
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
.Order
Mon 03/07 11:04 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Initial disclosures, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1), shall be made on or before February 26, 2016. (2) The parties shall appear for a status conference on June 6, 2016, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 21. (3) Expert disclosures shall be made on or before June 6, 2016. (4) Any motions to amend the pleadings and/or join additional parties shall be filed on or before June 13, 2016. (5) Discovery will close on July 5, 2016. (6) Any dispositive motions shall be filed on or before August 4, 2016. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/7/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 03/07 10:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 3/7/2016. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/07 11:50 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Expert disclosures shall be made on or before 6/6/2016; Any motions to amend the pleadings and/or join additional parties shall be filed on or before 6/13/2016; Discovery will close on 7/5/2016; Any dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 8/4/2016. A Status Conference is set for 6/6/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Mon 02/22 2:48 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Lankford, Lindsay) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
.Order
Mon 02/01 2:43 PM
ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for March 7, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Counsel who attend must be sufficiently familiar with the case to address all matters that can reasonably be anticipated for discussion and to answer any questions that may arise. In particular, in the event that Defendant Jerome Lewis does not entered an appearance in advance of the scheduling conference, the parties present for the scheduling conference should be prepared to discuss whether and how this case should proceed in light of his absence from the proceedings. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/1/2016. (lcrdm1, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 02/01 2:57 PM
Set/Reset Hearing: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 3/7/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) |
||
Sunday, January 31, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sun 01/31 3:34 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by SARAH JENKINS.(Turnipseed, Danielle) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sun 01/31 3:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Patrice Turnipseed on behalf of SARAH JENKINS (Turnipseed, Danielle) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Tue 12/29 7:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Jenkins' Motion to Alter or Amend Clerk's Entry of Default10 and Plaintiff's Response11 stating that it does not oppose the motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk's Entry of Default as to Sarah Jenkins, Jerome Lewis8 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/29/2015. (lcrdm1, ) |
||
Friday, December 18, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response to motion
Fri 12/18 3:39 PM
RESPONSE re10 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to9 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lankford, Lindsay) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Alter Judgment
Wed 12/16 11:11 AM
MOTION to Alter or Amend9 Clerk's Entry of Default by SARAH JENKINS (zrdj) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 12/09 12:17 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SARAH JENKINS, JEROME LEWIS (zrdj) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 12/08 3:10 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Lankford, Lindsay) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Mon 11/02 11:24 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JEROME LEWIS served on 10/23/2015, answer due 11/13/2015 (Lankford, Lindsay) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Wed 10/28 9:04 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SARAH JENKINS served on 10/21/2015, answer due 11/11/2015 (Lankford, Lindsay) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 10/13 9:38 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SARAH JENKINS, JEROME LEWIS.(zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Forms | ||
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/09 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Mumford, Jr on behalf of TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Mumford, John) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 10/08 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY re1 Complaint, (Lankford, Lindsay) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 10/08 12:03 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) |
||
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 10/07 12:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lankford, Lindsay) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/07 12:53 PM
COMPLAINT against JEROME LEWIS, SARAH JENKINS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4270215) filed by TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(Lankford, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C |