Bertanelli v. Roberts et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Rosenblatt |
Referred: | John Z Boyle |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02007 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 03, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 03/03 11:15 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed March 3, 2016, judgment of dismissal is entered. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. (GAR) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 03/03 11:13 AM
ORDER: The Court construes Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc.12 ) as a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 03-03-16.(GAR) |
|
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 03/01 11:47 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:12 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Unknown Brewer, Unknown Smith. (Dylo, Joseph) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 02/22 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Jonathan Cataldo Bertanelli. (GAR) (2 pages) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/19 1:33 PM
Defendants Brewer and Smith's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Unknown Brewer, Unknown Smith.(Dylo, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service Executed
Tue 02/02 3:27 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED : Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/21/15 to Lt. John Doe Smith (GAR) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Tue 02/02 3:26 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED : Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/21/15 to Lt. Brewer (GAR) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Expedite
Fri 12/04 2:35 PM
ORDER denying as moot5 Emergency Motion for Expedited Pre Screening Order to Effectuate Service for Filing of Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 12/4/15.(LSP) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Wed 11/18 12:41 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jonathan Bertanelli. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/17/15. (KGM) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order (Service Packet) ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 11/18 12:40 PM
ORDER (Service Packet): Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is not assessed an initial partial filing fee. Defendants Roberts, Girar, Hackney, Wiesinger, A. Sanchez, Espinoza, OConnor, Tomack, Esch, Carrasco, Walker, Scott, Downing, Nelson, Norris, Cerda, Calideria, Caldwell, Corsen, Stalder, O. Sanchez, Bell, Billyard, Riley, Plancarte, and Ames are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Smith and Brewer must answer the Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc.1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Smith and Brewer. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. The United States Marshal will not provide service of process if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on a Defendant within 120 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/17/15. (KGM) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Expedite
Tue 11/17 10:43 AM
EX PARTE Emergency MOTION to Expedite Pre Screening Order to Effectuate Service for Filing of "Preliminary Injunction" by Jonathan Cataldo Bertanelli. (5 pages) (REK) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment
Wed 10/07 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (KGM) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Wed 10/07 4:35 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jonathan Cataldo Bertanelli (8 pages). (KGM) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 10/07 4:34 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jonathan Cataldo Bertanelli (2 pages). (KGM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/07 4:33 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jonathan Cataldo Bertanelli (21 pages).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |