Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc. v. Birch Communications, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Totenberg |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-03562 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 04, 2016 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Birch Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
98 | 98
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/02 2:25 PM
ORDER granting97 Motion for Interim Distribution of Settlement Fund. As there is $1,220,441.50 remaining for distribution in the Settlement Fund, the Court GRANTS the Class Representatives Motion, and orders that AB Data, Ltd. make an interim distribution of $333,333.33 to Class Counsel as attorneys' fees (one-third of the February 4, 2019, $1,000,000 settlement payment); $31,486.86 to Class Counsel for the remaining one-half balance of attorney expenses approved by the Court in the Final Approval Order; $12,500.00 to the Abante's class representative for the second half of the incentive award approved by the Court; $36,662.50 to Class Counsel for expenses incurred with Pierce Bainbridge Beck Price & Hecht LLP, the bankruptcy counsel retained by Class Counsel,; and the administration costs for the final distribution, estimated to be $50,000; and the remaining balance of the Settlement Fund after the aforesaid amounts payments, to Settlement Class Members who cashed their first distribution check. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/2/21. (rlb) |