Otto Gibbs v. State of Delaware, et al
Original Case: 1:13-cv-00386
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-03424 |
Type | civil / private / habeas corpus-prisoner |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2016 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 09, 2015 6:21 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF DELAWARE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ATTORNEY GENERAL DELAWARE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
OTTO G. GIBBS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/09/2015 6:21 AM EDT |
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Otto G. Gibbs in District Court No. 1-13-cv-00386. (PDB) |