Ronald Munday v. Navy Federal Credit Union
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01629 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Jan 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2016 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Navy Federal Credit Union
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Munday
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
62 | 62
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 07/25 9:54 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court has entered Final Approval of the Parties Settlement Agreement. (Doc. 60). Accordingly, Plaintiffs and the Settlement Class Members claims against Navy Federal Credit Union are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and this Final Judgment shall issue consistent with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lwag) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
61 | 61
notice
Notice of Lodging
Tue 07/18 8:41 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Settlement60(Taylor, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment |