Santiago v. Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc. et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Houston |
Referred: | William V Gallo |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-02269 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441ed Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2016 2:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
California Sportservice, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eduardo Santiago
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Tue 06/13 8:46 AM
ORDER granting28 Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and entry of Judgment. Without affecting the finality of this Order, the Court shall retain continuing jurisdiction over the action and the Parties and Class, and the administration and enforcement of the Settlement. Any disputes or controversies arising with respect to the enforcement or implementation of the Settlement shall be presented by motion to the Court. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/12/2017. (jpp) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Final Approval Hearing
Thu 06/15 10:06 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Final Approval Hearing held on 6/12/2017. Motion [22-1] for Attorney fees, Litigation Costs and Class Representative Incentive payment are granted. Motion [28-1] for Settlement is granted. Court to issue order.(Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Derek J. Emge). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan Lawrence Brophy). (no document attached) (lwm) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 06/12 9:10 AM
ORDER granting30 request to appear telephonically at the Final Approval Hearing set for 6/12/2017 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/09/2017. (jpp) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Appear
Fri 06/09 2:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Final Approval Hearing by California Sportservice, Inc., Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc..(Brophy, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 [Proposed] Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 06/06 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Derek J Emge(Emge, Derek) (jpp) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/06 5:58 PM
NOTICE (Amended) of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc. re23 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement(Afar, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/27 8:58 AM
AMENDED ORDER granting Joint Motion to continue hearing. It is ordered that the date of March 27, 2017 set for hearing the motion is rescheduled to Monday, June 12, 2017 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/27/2017.(jpp) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Fri 03/24 4:25 PM
ORDER granting Joint Motion to continue hearing. It is ordered that the date of March 27, 2017 set for hearing the motion is rescheduled to Monday, May 29, 2017 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/24/2017. (jpp) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Supplemental Briefing
Wed 03/08 5:03 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendants California Sportservice, Inc., Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc. re23 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement .(Brophy, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 02/27 10:34 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc. re23 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Afar, Michael) (jpp) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Settlement
Fri 02/24 5:11 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc..(Afar, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael Afar ISO Joint Motion for Final Approval, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Derek J. Emge ISO Joint Motion for Final Approval, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Jarrod Salinas ISO of Joint Motion for Final Approval, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A (Salinas Declaration) | ||
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 12/16 2:35 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Costs and Class Representative Incentive Payment by Eduardo Santiago.(Emge, Derek) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Derek J. Emge, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "A" to Emge Decl., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "B" to Emge Decl., | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service | ||
21 | 21
misc
Withdrawal of Document
Fri 12/16 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Eduardo Santiago re20 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Costs and Class Representative Incentive Payment filed by Eduardo Santiago . (Emge, Derek) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 12/16 1:53 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees , Litigation Costs and Class Representative Incentive Payment by Eduardo Santiago.(Emge, Derek) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Derek J. Emge, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "A" to Emge Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "B" to Emge Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)
Wed 11/16 10:12 AM
ORDER granting17 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. There shall be a Settlement Fairness and Final Approval Hearing todetermine whether the Settlement will be finally approved as fair, reasonable, and adequate as to the Class Representatives and the Settlement Class. The hearing will take place on Monday, March 27, 2017, at 2:30pm. Class Counsel and Defense Counsel shall submit a joint [Proposed] Order of Final Approval and Good Faith Determination of Settlement, a joint Motion for Final Approval, and any supporting papers no later than February 24, 2017. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/16/2016. (jpp) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous (Other 2)
Mon 11/14 6:17 PM
Joint MOTION re16 Order, Supplemental Brief To Address Inconsistencies Noted by the Court for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc..(Afar, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous (Other 1)
Mon 11/14 6:02 PM
Amended MOTION re16 Order, Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc..(Afar, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 11/09 3:26 PM
ORDER vacating hearing date and directing parties to submit supplemental briefing. The November 14, 2016 hearing on the parties Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement is vacated. The parties shall file supplemental briefing on or before November 23, 2016. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/09/2016.(jpp) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous (Other 1)
Fri 09/30 3:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by California Sportservice, Inc., Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc..(Brophy, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Lawrence Brophy added to party California Sportservice, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Jonathan L. Brophy in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jonathan L. Brophy, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jonathan L. Brophy, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Derek J. Emge in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, | ||
Att: 6 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Wed 08/31 7:49 AM
ORDER Setting Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval Due Date for 09/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 08/30/2016.(ja1) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 08/29 8:22 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 8/26/2016. Appearing on behalf of Plaintiff: Derek Emge. Appearing on behalf of Defendant: Jon Meer.(no document attached) (ja1) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 08/12 11:44 AM
ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/26/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/12/2016.(jpp) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/15 3:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER regulating discovery and other pre-trial proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/15/2015.(jpp) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 12/08 1:58 PM
ORDER following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference/Case Management Conference held 12/07/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/08/2015.(jpp) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Early Neutral Evaluation Conference
Mon 12/07 5:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 12/7/2015(Plaintiff Attorney Derek Emge, Suzanne Emge). (Defendant Attorney Jon Meer, Michael Afar). (no document attached) (jsb) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Tue 11/03 1:34 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/3/2015.(sjt) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 11/02 10:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 11/2/2015(Plaintiff Attorney Derek Emge). (Defendant Attorney Jonathan Brophy, Michael Afar). (no document attached) (jsb) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 10/20 10:59 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference for 11/2/2015 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/20/2015.(jpp) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/16 1:58 PM
NOTICE by California Sportservice, Inc., Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc. of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) (Afar, Michael)Attorney Michael Afar added to party California Sportservice, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 10/09 2:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by California Sportservice, Inc., Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Delaware North Companies, Inc. for California Sportservice, Inc., Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc... (acc) |
|
3 | 3
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 10/09 2:24 PM
ANSWER to First Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) by California Sportservice, Inc., Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc.. (acc) |
|
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 10/09 2:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by California Sportservice, Inc., Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc.. (acc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 10/09 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2015 00029805-CU-OE-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8483699.), filed by California Sportservice, Inc., Delaware North Companies Sportservice, Inc.. The new case number is 3:15-cv-2269-JAH-WVG. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Brophy, Jonathan)ATTY MAINT(acc) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Superior Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C: Answer to Superior Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D: Superior Court Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F: Answer to First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration Stephen Nowaczyk, | ||
Att: 9 Proof of Service |