Williams et al v. B & J Inc
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Juneau |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:15-cv-02512 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:0740 Admiralty & Maritime Jurisdiction |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 09, 2016 3:59 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Wilfred C Nicholas, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
B & J Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
B & J, Inc.
181 Streeter Road
Lake Arthure, LA 70549 |
|
Defendant
B & J Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael St Germain
|
|
Plaintiff
Mouton L. Stacy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stacy L Mouton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shemetia M Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mouton L Stacy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shemetia M. Williams
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Wilfred C Nicholas, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
B & J Inc
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
Wilfred Nicholas
Terminated: 03/24/2016
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Wilfred Nicholas
Terminated: 03/24/2016
2735 Main Highway
Breaux Bridge, LA 70517 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
154 | 154
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Fri 09/13 3:45 PM
ORDER granting153 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above entitled and numbered suit and all complaints, claims, third party demands, counterclaims, interventions, cross-claims and other incidental demands be and they are hereby finally dismissed with full prejudice to all rights of plaintiffs, claimants, third party plaintiffs, counterclaimants, intervenors and cross-claimants.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that each party shall bear their own respective costs in these proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 9/13/19. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
153 | 153
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Thu 09/12 10:15 AM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Shemetia Williams, Stacy L Mouton, B & J Inc, Houston Casualty Co, Jalissa Nicholas, Joseph Nicholas, Sue Nicholas, Wilfred C Nicholas, Sr, Wilfred Nicholas, Michael St Germain.(aty,Hymel, Richard) Modified on 9/12/2019 to remove attorney for all parties and to add filers(Williams, L) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order |