Guilford v. Eaton, County of et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Maloney |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01053 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 11, 2016 4:30 AM EDT |
defendant
Eaton, County of
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Jonathan Frost
|
Represented By
|
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Brian Guilford
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 18 2017
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part motion for summary judgment 52; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) |
1. | Eaton County dismissed from lawsuit filed by family of teen shot at traffic stop (wzzm13.com) |
Submitted Mon 01/30/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
96 | 96
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 04/05 2:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
95 | 95
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 04/05 2:43 PM
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal73 this case is dismissed pursuant to FRAP 42(b) (pjw) |
|
94 | 94
motion
Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
Thu 04/05 11:05 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal by defendant Jonathon Frost (Dyer, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
93 | 93
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause (Deadline)
Wed 04/04 10:36 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 4/9/2018 no later than 12:00 p.m. (noon); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) |