Shirley v. Absolute Resolutions Corporation
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry E Hudson |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00614 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2016 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Absolute Resolutions Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Farlyn Shirley, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 02/01 2:18 PM
FINAL ORDER that this matter is before the Court on a12 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by the parties and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii). It appearing to this Court that all matters of controversy have been fully resolved and compromised, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 02/01/2016. (walk, ) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/15 1:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Absolute Resolutions Corporation. (Canter, Ronald) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Settlement (by Attorney)
Wed 01/06 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Farlyn Shirley, Jr (Pittman, Dale) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/11 4:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/11/2015) (rpiz) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 12/11 4:03 PM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 9:05 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6300 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) |
|
Wednesday, November 25, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/25 5:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Absolute Resolutions Corporation.(Canter, Ronald) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/25 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Scott Canter on behalf of Absolute Resolutions Corporation (Canter, Ronald) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 11/16 4:26 PM
ORDER (Granting Motion for Extension of Time). It appearing appropriate to do so, the4 Motion is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading is due November 30, 2015. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/16/2015. (ccol, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 11/16 3:03 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Absolute Resolutions Corporation. (Canter, Bradley) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 11/16 2:59 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Absolute Resolutions Corporation.(Canter, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 11/10 10:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farlyn Shirley, Jr.. Absolute Resolutions Corporation served on 10/26/2015, Answer due 11/16/2015. (Attachment: #1 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff). (walk, ) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 10/16 5:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Absolute Resolutions Corporation; mailed to Counsel for Plaintiff. (walk, ) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/16 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Farlyn Shirley, Jr. against Absolute Resolutions Corporation. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 34683030878).. (walk, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Receipt and | ||
Att: 9 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff |