AIX Energy, Inc.
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stacey G Jernigan |
Case #: | 3:15-bk-34245 |
Case Filed: | Oct 22, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 05, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Feb 17, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Nov 01, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
AIX Energy, Inc.
8401 N Central Expy Ste 840
Dallas, TX 75225-4403 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Jason R. Searcy, Ch. 11 Trustee
Searcy & Searcy, P.C. PO Box 3929
Longview, TX 75606 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Represented By
|