|
GPO
Oct 29 2015
STIPULATION and ORDER 1 for extension of time signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/28/2015. The United States shall file a Complaint for Forfeiture by 11/20/2015. (Marciel, M)
|
|
GPO
Nov 20 2015
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/19/15. The parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 12/21/2015. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
|
GPO
Dec 23 2015
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/22/15 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 01/20/16. (Benson, A)
|
|
GPO
Jan 21 2016
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/20/16 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 02/19/16. (Benson, A)
|
|
GPO
Feb 23 2016
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 02/22/16 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 03/21/16. (Benson, A)
|
|
GPO
Mar 30 2016
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/29/16: The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to April 20, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
|
|
GPO
Apr 14 2016
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/13/16 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to May 30, 2016.(Becknal, R)
|
|
GPO
Jun 02 2016
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/1/16 ORDERING the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 6/29/16. (Jackson, T)
|
|
GPO
Jun 30 2016
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/29/16: The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is extended to August 29, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
|
|
GPO
Aug 01 2016
CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/29/16. Upon entry of the Consent Judgment of Forfeiture, Approximately $10,420.00 in U.S. Currency, together with any interest that may have accrued on the total amount seized, shall be forfeited to the United States pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 881(a)(6), to be disposed of according to law. Upon entry of the Consent Judgment of Forfeiture, but no later than 60 days thereafter, Approximately $10,480.00 in U.S. Currency shall be returned to claimant Roberta Edd through her attorney Thomas W. Barth. All parties will bear their own costs and attorney's fees. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|