Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc. et al v. Harris et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey S White |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-04939 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 24, 2016 1:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
M.D. Karen Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charles J. McKee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cindy Day-Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Colantuono
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christopher A. Callihan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alison Barrat-Green
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
County Counsel Alison Barrat-Green
|
|
Defendant
County Counsel Charles J McKee
|
|
Defendant
Kamala Harris
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City Attorney Cindy Day-Wilson
|
|
Defendant
City Attorney Michael Colantuono
|
|
Defendant
City Attorney Christopher A Callihan
|
|
Defendant
County Counsel Jeffrey S Blanck
|
|
Petitioner
Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pregnancy Care Center of the North Coast, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Confidence Pregnancy Center Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Jeffrey S. Blanck
Terminated: 03/25/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 11/10 11:05 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 11/09 12:24 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Confidence Pregnancy Center Inc., Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc., Pregnancy Care Center of the North Coast, Inc... (Tyler, Robert) (Filed on 11/9/2015) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/04 10:48 AM
First Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to Alison Barrat-Green, Jeffrey S. Blanck, Christopher A. Callihan, Michael Colantuono, Cindy Day-Wilson, Charles J. McKee. (mclS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/03 10:54 AM
Proposed Summons. (Tyler, Robert) (Filed on 11/3/2015) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 11/02 2:26 PM
Proposed Summons. (Tyler, Robert) (Filed on 11/2/2015) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/02 2:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byConfidence Pregnancy Center Inc., Pregnancy Care Center of the North Coast, Inc., Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc.. (Tyler, Robert) (Filed on 11/2/2015) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 11/02 10:55 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2016 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 11/02 10:57 AM
Electronic filing error. This filing was incomplete and will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc., Pregnancy Care Center of the North Coast, Inc., Confidence Pregnancy Center Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 10/30 1:07 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 11/13/2015. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/28 8:29 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey R. Surtees ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9947624.) filed by Confidence Pregnancy Center Inc., Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc., Pregnancy Care Center of the North Coast, Inc..(Manion, Francis) (Filed on 10/28/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing | ||
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/28 8:25 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Francis J. Manion ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9947581.) filed by Confidence Pregnancy Center Inc., Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc., Pregnancy Care Center of the North Coast, Inc..(Manion, Francis) (Filed on 10/28/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 10/27 2:17 PM
Proposed Summons. (Tyler, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2015) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/27 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Alison Barrat-Green, Jeffrey S Blanck, Christopher A Callihan, Michael Colantuono, Cindy Day-Wilson, Kamala Harris, Charles J McKee, Karen Smith ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9946063.). Filed byConfidence Pregnancy Center Inc., Pregnancy Care Center of the North Coast, Inc., Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc..(Tyler, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |