Medgebow v. Merchant Capital Source, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Referred: | Dave Lee Brannon |
Case #: | 9:15-cv-81497 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 28, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 25, 2016 4:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
First Pacific Marketing, LLC
1048 Irvine Avenue Suite 235
Huntington Beach, CA 92648 |
|
Plaintiff
Joel Medgebow
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Merchant Capital Source, LLC
Terminated: 03/03/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order Administrative Order
Mon 03/14 10:59 AM
ORDER CLOSING CASE re40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Joel Medgebow. Motions DENIED AS MOOT:30 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order to Bifurcate and/or Stay or Limit Class-Based Discovery filed by Merchant Capital Source, LLC,28 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class filed by Joel Medgebow,27 MOTION for Modification of Pre-Trial Deadlines re9 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, filed by Joel Medgebow,7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class and Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings and Briefing on that Motion filed by Joel Medgebow. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/11/2016. (lh) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/04 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to First Pacific Marketing, LLC by Joel Medgebow (Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order Dismissing Party
Fri 03/04 10:15 AM
Order Terminating Defendant: Dismissing Party Merchant Capital Source, LLC (a California limited liability company) re37 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/3/2016. (lh) |
|
38 | 38
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 03/04 10:11 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Show Cause Response due by 3/9/2016. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/3/2016. (lh) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 02/16 12:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Merchant Capital Source, LLC by Joel Medgebow (Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order
Mon 02/01 2:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. On January 28, 2016, Plaintiff informed the Court that he has settled his claims as against Defendant Merchant Capital Source, LLC. Plaintiff and Defendant Merchant Capital Source, LLC shall file appropriate closing documents by February 19, 2016. The Parties are reminded that all deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/1/2016. (kcr) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 01/28 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Joel Medgebow (Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order
Thu 01/21 3:55 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. On January 14, 2016, Defendant Merchant Capital Source, LLC filed a Response in Opposition and Motion to Deny and/or Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Motion for Class Certification (DE 31). The Response did not, however, address the merits of the Supplemental Motion. See(DE 28). Defendant Merchant Capital Source, LLC is, therefore, ordered to respond by January 29, 2016 as to the merits of the Supplemental Motion, to which Plaintiff may reply by February 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/21/2016. (kcr) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 01/20 5:10 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class filed by Joel Medgebow. (Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 01/19 6:38 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order to Bifurcate and/or Stay or Limit Class-Based Discovery filed by Joel Medgebow. Replies due by 1/29/2016. (Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 01/14 6:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class and Motion to Deny and/or Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for Class Certification filed by Merchant Capital Source, LLC. Replies due by 1/25/2016.(Rabinowitz, Veronica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Protective Order
Mon 01/11 8:29 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order to Bifurcate and/or Stay or Limit Class-Based Discovery by Merchant Capital Source, LLC.(Rabinowitz, Veronica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 12/28 7:02 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Merchant Capital Source, LLC. (Rabinowitz, Veronica) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Certify Class
Mon 12/28 5:57 PM
Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class by Joel Medgebow. Responses due by 1/14/2016(Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Initial Discovery to Merchant, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Redacted Sales Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Medgebow Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Class Counsel Resume's, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E: First Pacific Website Pages | ||
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/23 10:55 AM
MOTION for Modification of Pre-Trial Deadlines re9 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, by Joel Medgebow.(Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Wed 12/23 9:17 AM
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Merchant Capital Source, LLC (Rabinowitz, Veronica) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 12/23 8:47 AM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECONSIDER24 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/22/2015. (lrz) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Reconsideration
Fri 12/18 4:11 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Joel Medgebow.(Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Amended Scheduling Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Plaintiff's Initial Discovery to Merchant Capital, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 12/17 3:18 PM
ORDER denying22 Joint Motion FOR Modification OF Pre-trial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/17/2015. (srd) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/15 5:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Modification of Pre-Trial Deadlines re9 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, by Joel Medgebow.(Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 10, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/10 3:55 PM
Summons Issued as to First Pacific Marketing, LLC. (lh) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Thu 12/10 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) regarding First Pacific Marketing, LLC by Joel Medgebow re19 Amended Complaint filed by Joel Medgebow (Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons for Issuance | ||
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 12/09 10:28 PM
Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Merchant Capital Source, LLC, First Pacific Marketing, LLC, filed by Joel Medgebow.(Pascucci, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 12/09 5:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merchant Capital Source, LLC (Krimsky, Beth-Ann) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 12/07 5:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class and Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings and Briefing on that Motion filed by Merchant Capital Source, LLC. Replies due by 12/17/2015. (Krimsky, Beth-Ann) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/04 3:40 PM
ORDER denying11 Motion to Stay and Modify Pre-trial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/4/2015. (lh) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 12/03 2:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by December 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/3/2015. (kcr) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline
Fri 12/04 11:33 AM
Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Merchant Capital Source, LLC response due 12/17/2015. (lh) |
||
Wednesday, December 02, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 12/02 8:56 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Beth-Ann Ellenberg Krimsky on behalf of Merchant Capital Source, LLC (Krimsky, Beth-Ann) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 12/02 8:34 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint ,11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Stay and Modification of Pre-Trial Deadlines re9 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, filed by Merchant Capital Source, LLC. Replies due by 12/14/2015. (Krimsky, Beth-Ann) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 12/01 6:42 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint filed by Joel Medgebow. Replies due by 12/11/2015. (Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/01 5:43 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Stay and Modification of Pre-Trial Deadlines re9 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, by Joel Medgebow.(Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 12/01 5:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Merchant Capital Source, LLC. Attorney Beth-Ann Ellenberg Krimsky added to party Merchant Capital Source, LLC(pty:dft).(Krimsky, Beth-Ann) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation
Mon 11/23 5:01 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2015., Discovery due by 3/14/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2015., Motions due by 3/28/2016., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/16/2016.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 11/23/2015. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 11/23 3:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/23/2015. Seth Lehrman and Michael Pascucci present for Plaintiff. Peter Rundle monitored the conference for Defendant. The Court will enter a pretrial scheduling and mediation order. (Digital/Time in Court: 15:06:59 / 10 mins.) (js00) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Certify Class Stay
Fri 11/20 5:26 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class and ( Responses due by 12/7/2015), Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings and Briefing on that Motion by Joel Medgebow. (Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 11/06 1:50 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. ( Telephone Conference set for 11/23/2015 at 3:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon.) At least 48 hours before the conference, Plaintiff's counsel shall provide the Court (brannon@flsd.uscourts.gov) and opposing counsel with a dial-in conference call number. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. The parties must be prepared at their assigned time but may have to wait 10-20 minutes before their conference begins, as the Court sets three cases per 30-minute time slot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 11/6/2015. (sa) |
|
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Judge
Fri 11/06 1:30 PM
ORDER Referring Case and Setting Trial Date: ( Jury Trial set for 6/13/2016 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/8/2015 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for For Scheduling Conference with receipt of notices for all filings in case Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/5/2015. (cqs) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 11/06 1:53 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Calendar Call set for 6/8/2016 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Status Conference set for 6/8/2016 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. See DE 5 Order Referring Case and Setting Trial Date (dm) |
||
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/28 3:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Merchant Capital Source, LLC. (bb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Wed 10/28 3:12 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (bb) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Wed 10/28 3:12 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks (bb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/28 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Merchant Capital Source, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8201228, filed by Joel Medgebow.(Eggnatz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |